Lenhardt v. City of Mankato, Kansas, et al
Plaintiff: Ursula Lenhardt
Defendant: Mankato, Kansas, City of, Paul Bohnert, Chris Rhea, Matthew Pierce and Edward Hood
Case Number: 5:2018cv04151
Filed: December 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Sam A Crow
Referring Judge: Kenneth G Gale
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 9607
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2019 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM & ORDER: Plaintiff has twenty days to file an amended complaint alleging facts sufficient to establish diversity jurisdiction under this statute. Re #18 MOTION for Reconsideration MOTION correct civil cover sheet to diversity jurisdiction filed by Ursula Lenhardt. See order for details. Signed by U.S. District Senior Judge Sam A. Crow on 2/8/19. Mailed to pro se party Ursula Lenhardt by regular mail (msb)
February 5, 2019 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #18 MOTION for Reconsideration MOTION correct civil cover sheet to diversity jurisdiction. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(df)
January 31, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Reconsideration, MOTION correct civil cover sheet to diversity jurisdiction (Response deadline 2/14/2019) by Plaintiff Ursula Lenhardt (msb)
January 30, 2019 Filing 17 JUDGMENT ENTERED: Plaintiff's action is dismissed for failure to allege a claim giving this court subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 1/30/19. Mailed to pro se party Ursula Lenhardt by regular mail (msb)
January 30, 2019 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER accepting Report and Recommendations #7 as modified in order. Plaintiff's action is dismissed for failure to allege a claim giving this court subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by U.S. District Senior Judge Sam A. Crow on 1/30/19. Mailed to pro se party Ursula Lenhardt by regular mail (msb)
January 22, 2019 Filing 15 SUPPLEMENT to #14 Objection to Report and Recommendations by Plaintiff Ursula Lenhardt. (Attachment: #1 Fax Cover Sheet)(msb)
January 18, 2019 Filing 14 OBJECTION to #7 Report and Recommendations by Plaintiff Ursula Lenhardt (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Transmittal Letter)(msb)
January 14, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT returned, addressed to Ursula Lenhardt, and delivered on 1/11/2019. (mls)
January 9, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT returned re #6 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel #7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Complaint filed by Ursula Lenhardt. (sz)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER re 9 Order on Motion to Amend Complaint. Although the undersigned Magistrate Judge has granted Plaintiff's #8 motion to amend #1 Complaint, the Court clarifies that this does not change or impact the prior REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Dismissal #7 to The District Court regarding Plaintiff's #1 Complaint. The undersigned Magistrate continues to recommend dismissal for the reasons set forth in his prior Order #7 . Plaintiff shall, however, have fourteen (14 days) from service of this Minute Order to serve and file with the U.S. District Judge assigned to the case, any written objections to the findings of fact, conclusions of law, or recommendations of dismissal of the undersigned Magistrate Judge as stated in his prior Order #7 . Plaintiff's failure to file such written, specific objections within the 14-day period will bar appellate review of the proposed findings of fact, conclusions of law, and the recommended disposition. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 1/8/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(df)
January 8, 2019 NOTICE Re: Pro Se Mailing. Document 11 Order, mailed to Ursula Lenhardt on 1/8/2019 by certified mail ; Certified Tracking Number 70123050000111900503. (aw)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Amend Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 1/4/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (df)
January 4, 2019 NOTICE Re: Pro Se Mailing. Document 9 Order on Motion to Amend Complaint mailed to Ursula Lenhardt on 1/4/2019 by regular mail. (aw)
January 3, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Amend defendant City of Mankato to Board of the City of Mankato by Plaintiff Ursula Lenhardt (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale). (mls)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Dismissal re #1 Complaint filed by Ursula Lenhardt. This document also serves as the MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and denying #4 Motion to Appoint Counsel. It is included in the Court's docketing system as two documents for administrative/tracking purposes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 1/3/19. Mailed to pro se party Ursula Lenhardt by certified mail. (df)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; denying #4 Motion to Appoint Counsel. This document also serves as the REPORT & RECOMMENDATION of Dismissal to the District Court. It is included in the Court's docketing system as two documents for administrative/tracking purposes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 1/3/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (df)
January 3, 2019 NOTICE Re: Pro Se Mailing. Document #7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Complaint filed by Ursula Lenhardt, #6 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis,, Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel, mailed to Ursula Lenhardt on 1/3/2019 by both regular mail and certified mail ; Certified Tracking Number 70123050000111900497. (aw)
December 31, 2018 Filing 10 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Ursula Lenhardt. (#1 Attachment) (mls)
December 27, 2018 Filing 5 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Ursula Lenhardt. (ht)
December 21, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Plaintiff Ursula Lenhardt (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale). (jal)
December 21, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Ursula Lenhardt (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale). NOTE - Access to document is restricted pursuant to the courts privacy policy. (Attachments: #1 Financial Affidavit) (jal)
December 21, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Ursula Lenhardt. (jal)
December 21, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (No Summons Issued) with trial location of Topeka, filed by Ursula Lenhardt. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (jal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lenhardt v. City of Mankato, Kansas, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mankato, Kansas, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Bohnert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Rhea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Hood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ursula Lenhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?