Bonner (ID 93271) v. Corizon et al

Plaintiff: Maureko M. Bonner
Defendant: (fnu) Rais, Lezlee Carneal, (fnu) Dakkil, Corizon, (fnu) Leiber and (fnu) Dakkil, Jr.
Interested Party: Kansas Department of Corrections
Case Number: 5:2019cv03005
Filed: January 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Sam A Crow
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2019 WAIVERS OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS ISSUED as to Defendants Lezlee Carneal, (fnu) Dakkil, (fnu) Leiber, (fnu) Dakkil, Jr. and (fnu) Rais. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (smnd) Modified text to add defendant Dakkil, Jr. on 2/27/2019 (smnd)
February 26, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Defendant Corizon (issued to US Marshal for service). (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (smnd)
February 26, 2019 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ENTERED: The Clerk of the Court shall prepare summons to be served pursuant to Rule 4(c)(3) on defendant Corizon by the U.S. Marshal at no cost to Plaintiff. The Clerk of the Court shall prepare waiver of service forms for the remaining defendants, pursuant to Rule 4(d) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, to be served at no cost to Plaintiff absent a finding by the Court that Plaintiff is able to pay such costs. The report required herein shall be filed no later than sixty (60) days from the date of this order, and Defendants' answers shall be filed within sixty (60) days following receipt of that report by counsel for Defendants or as set forth in the waiver of service, whichever is later. The Clerk of Court shall enter KDOC as an interested party on the docket for the limited purpose of preparing the Martinez Report ordered herein. Upon the filing of that report, KDOC may move for termination from this action. Signed by U.S. Senior District Judge Sam A. Crow on 02/26/19. Mailed to pro se party Maureko M. Bonner by regular mail. (smnd)
February 5, 2019 INITIAL PARTIAL FILING FEE PAID on 02/05/2019. Receipt number T4631012543, in the amount of $ 12.50. (jal)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER ENTERED: Plaintiff's motions to proceed in forma pauperis #2 & #4 are granted. The Court assesses an initial partial filing fee of $12.50, calculated under 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(1). Plaintiff is granted fourteen (14) days from receipt of this order to submit the fee. Any objection to this order must be filed on or before the date payment is due. The failure to pay the fee as directed may result in the dismissal of this matter without further notice. Plaintiff remains obligated to pay the remainder of the $350.00 filing fee. The agency having custody of plaintiff shall forward payments from plaintiff's account in installments calculated under 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(2). The clerk is to transmit a copy of this order to plaintiff, to the finance office at the institution where plaintiff is currently confined, and to the court's finance office. Entered by U.S. Senior District Judge Sam A. Crow on 01/28/19. Mailed to pro se party Maureko M. Bonner by regular mail. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (smnd)
January 28, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Maureko M. Bonner (Attachments: #1 Inmate Account Statement) (smnd)
January 14, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Mailed to pro se party Maureko M. Bonner by regular mail. Response deadline 2/13/2019. (smnd)
January 14, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Maureko M. Bonner (smnd)
January 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Maureko M. Bonner (smnd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bonner (ID 93271) v. Corizon et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: (fnu) Rais
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lezlee Carneal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: (fnu) Dakkil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corizon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: (fnu) Leiber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: (fnu) Dakkil, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maureko M. Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Kansas Department of Corrections
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Cowger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?