Jones v. Pacedes et al

Plaintiff: Thaddeus Jones
Defendant: Jeff Easter, Jose Pacedes and Ruben Guitierrez
Case Number: 5:2019cv03017
Filed: February 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Sam A Crow
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Intent to Dismiss Complaint by Plaintiff Thaddeus Jones (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (current docket sheet and Order dismissing matter mailed to Plaintiff Jones) (smnd)
February 12, 2019 Filing 4 JUDGMENT regarding Order #3 dismissing matter. ***Terminating Case. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 02/12/19. Mailed to pro se party Thaddeus Jones by regular mail. (smnd)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER ENTERED: This matter is dismissed. The Clerk is directed to file Doc. #1 as an amended complaint in Jones v. Easter, Case No. 17-3089-EFM-KGG. Signed by U.S. Senior District Judge Sam A. Crow on 02/12/19. Mailed to pro se party Thaddeus Jones by regular mail. (smnd)
February 7, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY mailed to pro se party Thaddeus Jones by regular mail. Response deadline 3/11/2019. (smnd)
February 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Thaddeus Jones (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (smnd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Pacedes et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Easter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Pacedes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruben Guitierrez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thaddeus Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?