Rohan (ID 122011) v. Saline County Jail et al
Plaintiff: Christopher Scott Rohan
Defendant: Jamie (lnu), Saline County Jail, Lou Miller, Austin Baker, Maggie (lnu), Tina Miller, Michael Sutton, David Wallace, Jamie Nutz and Sarah Shaft
Case Number: 5:2019cv03068
Filed: April 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Office: Topeka Office
Presiding Judge: Sam A Crow
Referring Judge: Angel D Mitchell
2 Judge: Holly L Teeter
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 28 ANSWER to #13 Amended Complaint by Lou Miller, Jamie Nutz.(Eckenrode, J.)
July 1, 2019 Filing 27 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lou Miller. Lou Miller waiver sent on 6/13/2019, answer due 8/12/2019. (Eckenrode, J.)
July 1, 2019 Filing 26 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by J. Thaddeus Eckenrode on behalf of Lou Miller (Eckenrode, J.)
June 25, 2019 Filing 25 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed - Prisoner Case by Tina Miller. Tina Miller waiver sent on 6/13/2019, answer due 8/12/2019. (Stewart, Michelle)
June 20, 2019 Filing 24 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Austin Baker. Austin Baker waiver sent on 5/21/2019, answer due 7/22/2019., WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed - Prisoner Case by Austin Baker. Austin Baker waiver sent on 5/21/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. (Cooper, David)
June 20, 2019 Filing 23 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by David R. Cooper on behalf of Austin Baker (Cooper, David)
June 18, 2019 Filing 22 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jamie Nutz. Jamie Nutz waiver sent on 5/21/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. (Eckenrode, J.)
June 18, 2019 Filing 21 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by J. Thaddeus Eckenrode on behalf of Jamie Nutz. (Eckenrode, J.)
June 17, 2019 Filing 20 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Jennifer R. Johnson on behalf of Lou Miller, Tina Miller, Sarah Shaft, Michael Sutton, David Wallace. (Johnson, Jennifer)
June 17, 2019 Filing 19 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Michelle R. Stewart on behalf of Lou Miller, Tina Miller, Sarah Shaft, Michael Sutton, David Wallace. (Stewart, Michelle)
June 13, 2019 Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: Case reassigned to District Judge Holly L. Teeter and Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell for all further proceedings. Senior District Judge Sam A. Crow no longer assigned to case. Entered by Deputy Clerk on 06/13/19. Mailed to pro se party Christopher Scott Rohan by regular mail. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (smnd)
June 13, 2019 WAIVERS OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS ISSUED as to Defendants Lou Miller and Tina Miller. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (smnd)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER ENTERED: The court shall treat Doc. No. #13 as a second amended complaint raising an excessive force claim against Austin Baker and medical neglect claims against Jamie Nutz, Sarah Shaft, Lou Miller, David Wallace, Michael Sutton and Tina Miller. The court directs the Clerk of the Court prepare waiver of service forms pursuant to Rule 4(d) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure to be served upon Tina Miller and Lou Miller. The screening process under 28 U.S.C. 1915A having been completed, this matter is returned to the Clerk of the Court for random reassignment for all further proceedings pursuant to D. Kan. R. 40.1. Signed by U.S. District Senior Judge Sam A. Crow on 06/13/19. Mailed to pro se party Christopher Scott Rohan by regular mail. (smnd)
June 4, 2019 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed - Prisoner Case by Michael Sutton. Michael Sutton waiver sent on 5/21/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. (Stewart, Michelle)
June 4, 2019 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed - Prisoner Case by David Wallace. David Wallace waiver sent on 5/21/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. (Stewart, Michelle)
June 4, 2019 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed - Prisoner Case by Sarah Shaft. Sarah Shaft waiver sent on 5/21/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. (Stewart, Michelle)
May 30, 2019 Filing 13 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Christopher Scott Rohan.(ctv)
May 30, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Change of Address by Christopher Scott Rohan #122011: now at P.O. Box 311, El Dorado, KS 67042 (Attachments: #1 Envelope). (jal)
May 28, 2019 INITIAL PARTIAL FILING FEE PAID on 05/28/19, Receipt Number W4631018713, in the amount of $18.00. (Payment in the amount of $23.29 was received of which $18.00 was the initial partial filing fee.) (smnd)
May 21, 2019 WAIVERS OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS ISSUED as to Defendants Austin Baker, Jamie Nutz, Sarah Shaft, Michael Sutton and David Wallace. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (smnd)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER ENTERED: The court directs that the Clerk of the Court prepare waiver of service forms pursuant to Rule 4(d) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure to be served upon Michael Sutton; Sarah Shaft; David Wallace; Jamie Notz and Austin Baker. The court shall dismiss defendants Lou Miller and Tina Miller from this case unless plaintiff shows cause by June 11, 2019, why he has stated a claim against these defendants or files a second amended complaint by June 11, 2019, which states a plausible claim against them. Maggie K-9 shall be dismissed. Signed by U.S. District Senior Judge Sam A. Crow on 05/21/19. Mailed to pro se party Christopher Scott Rohan by regular mail. (smnd)
May 20, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Christopher Scott Rohan re #4 Order. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (smnd)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER ENTERED: Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis #2 is granted. The Court assesses an initial partial filing fee of $18.00, calculated under 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(1). Plaintiff is granted fourteen (14) days from receipt of this order to submit the fee. Any objection to this order must be filed on or before the date payment is due. The failure to pay the fee as directed may result in the dismissal of this matter without further notice. Plaintiff remains obligated to pay the remainder of the $350.00 filing fee. The agency having custody of plaintiff shall forward payments from plaintiff's account in installments calculated under 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(2). The clerk is to transmit a copy of this order to plaintiff, to the finance office at the institution where plaintiff is currently confined, and to the court's finance office. Entered by U.S. Senior District Judge Sam A. Crow on 05/17/19. Mailed to pro se party Christopher Scott Rohan by regular mail. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (smnd)
May 17, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Jamie Nunz, Michael Sutton, Tina Miller, Sarah Shaft, David Wallace, Austin Baker, Maggie (lnu) and Lou Miller filed by Plaintiff Christopher Scott Rohan. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (smnd)
May 17, 2019 Filing 7 SUPPLEMENT to #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Christopher Scott Rohan. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (smnd)
May 1, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: A copy of the #4 Order filed April 30, 2019, was remailed to Plaintiff Rohan at Saline County Jail, as well as a current docket sheet. (smnd)
May 1, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN mail received re #3 Notice of Deficiency addressed to Plaintiff Christopher Scott Rohan (Return to Sender); Remailed to Plaintiff Rohan at Saline County Jail (smnd)
May 1, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Change of Address by Plaintiff Christopher Scott Rohan: now at Saline County Jail, P.O. Box 1606, Salina, Kansas 67402 (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (smnd)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER ENTERED: The court directs that defendant Saline County Jail be dismissed. The court further directs that the Clerk of the Court prepare waiver of service forms pursuant to Rule 4(d) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure to be served upon Jamie LNU. Plaintiff has the primary responsibility to provide sufficient name and address information for the waiver of service forms or for the service of summons and complaint upon a defendant. Plaintiff is warned that if waiver of service forms or summons cannot be served because of the lack of name and address information, and correct address information is not supplied to the Clerk of the Court, ultimately the unserved parties may be dismissed from this action. Signed by U.S. Senior District Judge Sam A. Crow on 04/30/19. Mailed to pro se party Christopher Scott Rohan by regular mail. (smnd)
April 23, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis mailed to pro se party Christopher Scott Rohan by regular mail. Response deadline 5/23/2019. (smnd)
April 22, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Christopher Scott Rohan (smnd)
April 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Christopher Scott Rohan (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (smnd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rohan (ID 122011) v. Saline County Jail et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Scott Rohan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamie (lnu)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saline County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lou Miller
Represented By: Michelle R. Stewart
Represented By: J. Thaddeus Eckenrode
Represented By: Jennifer R. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Austin Baker
Represented By: David R. Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maggie (lnu)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tina Miller
Represented By: Michelle R. Stewart
Represented By: Jennifer R. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Sutton
Represented By: Michelle R. Stewart
Represented By: Jennifer R. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Wallace
Represented By: Michelle R. Stewart
Represented By: Jennifer R. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamie Nutz
Represented By: J. Thaddeus Eckenrode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarah Shaft
Represented By: Michelle R. Stewart
Represented By: Jennifer R. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?