Johnson (ID 106724) v. Snyder
Petitioner: Rheuben Clifford Johnson
Respondent: Paul Snyder
Case Number: 5:2019cv03076
Filed: April 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Sam A Crow
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION Requesting Pre-Release From Incarceration by Petitioner Rheuben Clifford Johnson. (smnd)
May 13, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDMENT by Petitioner Rheuben Clifford Johnson to #3 EMERGENCY MOTION for Stay of the State District Court Order (smnd)
May 9, 2019 Filing 5 CORRECTED DOCUMENT re #2 BRIEF IN SUPPORT of Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Supplement by Rheuben Clifford Johnson (smnd)
April 29, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Order (titled Request to Submit an Initial Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254) Without It Counting as the Single Allowed 2254 Filing) by Petitioner Rheuben Clifford Johnson (smnd)
April 29, 2019 Filing 3 EMERGENCY MOTION for Stay of the State District Court Order by Petitioner Rheuben Clifford Johnson (smnd)
April 29, 2019 Filing 2 BRIEF IN SUPPORT of #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Petitioner Rheuben Clifford Johnson (smnd)
April 29, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS filed by Petitioner Rheuben Clifford Johnson (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (smnd)
April 29, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Notice sent to Plaintiff Rheuben Clifford Johnson advising he is incarcerated in a facility with mandatory electronic filing and should follow instructions available at the facility for transmitting pleadings electronically to the court. (smnd)
April 29, 2019 FILING FEE PAID in the amount of $5.00, receipt number T4631012785 (smnd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson (ID 106724) v. Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Rheuben Clifford Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Paul Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?