DeHart v. Board of Commissioners of Riley County, Kansas

Plaintiff: Steven DeHart
Defendant: Riley County Board of Commissioners and Board of County Commissioners of Riley County, Kansas
Case Number: 5:2019cv04022
Filed: March 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Kenneth G Gale
Referring Judge: Holly L Teeter
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Board of County Commissioners of Riley County, Kansas of Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosure Documents (Laushman, Lauren)
June 14, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Steven DeHart of Plaintiff Steven Dehart's Rule 26(a) Initial Disclosures (Lanterman, Stephen)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER: Estimated trial time seven days. Discovery deadline 10/11/2019. Dispositive motion deadline 11/15/2019. Mediation deadline 9/13/2019. Mediation Notice or Confidential Settlement Report Due to Magistrate Judge on 8/9/2019. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 10/15/2019. Jury Trial set for 7/20/2020 at 09:30 AM in Topeka Courtroom 401 (HLT) before District Judge Holly L. Teeter. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/22/2019 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale. See attached Order for additional deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 6/6/19. (aw)
June 5, 2019 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 6/5/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (aw)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 6/3/19. (aw)
May 31, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Board of County Commissioners of Riley County, Kansas of Initial Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures (Cooper, David)
May 31, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Steven DeHart of Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures Pursuant to FRCP Rule 26(a) (Lanterman, Stephen)
May 8, 2019 Filing 10 Counterclaim Defendant's ANSWER to #8 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Steven DeHart.(Lanterman, Stephen)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 6/5/2019 at 03:00 PM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale. Counsel should call 888-363-4749 and enter access code 5407703 to participate on the conference. Report of Parties Planning Meeting deadline 5/31/2019. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 5/31/2019. See attached Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 4/30/19. (aw)
April 17, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Steven DeHart by Board of County Commissioners of Riley County, Kansas.(Cooper, David)
April 8, 2019 Filing 7 STATE COURT RECORDS from Riley County District Court. (Attachments: #1 State Court Records)(Cooper, David)
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant's Answer or other responsive pleading due 4/17/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 4/4/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (aw)
April 3, 2019 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant Board of County Commissioners of Riley County, Kansas (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Cooper, David)
March 28, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Holly L. Teeter and Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jal)
March 27, 2019 Filing 4 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME for Defendant Board of County Commissioners of Riley County, Kansas to answer or otherwise plead. (FILED IN RILEY COUNTY DISTRICT COURT ON 3/25/19; NO.PDF ATTACHED). Signed by deputy clerk on 3/25/2019. (mls)
March 27, 2019 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendant Riley County Board of Commissioners - trial to be held in Topeka. (Cooper, David)
March 27, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Defendant Riley County Board of Commissioners. (Cooper, David)
March 27, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Riley County District Court, case number 2019-CV-000038 Trial location of Topeka ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4757316.), filed by Riley County Board of Commissioners. (Attachments: #1 Ex A State Court Pleadings, #2 Ex B Notice of Removal State Court)(Cooper, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DeHart v. Board of Commissioners of Riley County, Kansas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riley County Board of Commissioners
Represented By: David R. Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of County Commissioners of Riley County, Kansas
Represented By: David R. Cooper
Represented By: Lauren E. Laushman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven DeHart
Represented By: Stephen Douglas Lanterman
Represented By: Ryan Michael Brungardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?