Erickson v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Taylor Erickson
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Case Number: 5:2019cv04023
Filed: March 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Teresa J James
Referring Judge: Holly L Teeter
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE OF SERVICE by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company of Supplemental Response to Plaintiff Request for Admissions (West, Craig)
July 8, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE OF SERVICE by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company of Discovery Requests (West, Craig)
July 5, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF SERVICE by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company of Discovery Responses (West, Craig)
June 28, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF SERVICE by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company of Discovery Responses (West, Craig)
June 20, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Second Requests for Admissions and First Set of Interrogatories by Taylor Erickson. (Bretz, Matthew)
June 19, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF SERVICE by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company of Discovery Requests (West, Craig)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: One or both parties will file a motion for summary judgment on the issue of proper notice. Discovery deadline 9/3/2019. Dispositive motion deadline 9/16/2019. Discovery on all other issues is stayed pending ruling on the dispositive motions(s) regarding the notice issue. If summary judgment is not granted, the parties must contact chambers within 14 days to set a scheduling conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 6/11/2019. (ck)
May 29, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Requests for Admissions and Requests for Production of Documents by Taylor Erickson. (Bretz, Matthew)
May 28, 2019 Filing 9 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James: TELEPHONE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 5/28/2019. Scheduling Order to follow. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (mn)
May 20, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company of Defendant's Rule 26 Disclosures. (West, Craig)
April 30, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Initial Disclosures by Taylor Erickson. (Young, Melinda)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 5/28/2019 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James. Participating counsel shall dial 1-888-363-4749 and enter access code 4901386 to join the conference. Completed Report of Parties' Planning Conference and Rule 26 Initial Disclosures due 5/21/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 4/10/2019. (mn)
April 5, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company . (West, Craig)
April 5, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.(West, Craig)
March 29, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Holly L. Teeter and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (mls)
March 29, 2019 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company - trial to be held in Wichita. (West, Craig)
March 29, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (West, Craig)
March 29, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Shawnee County District Court, case number 19 CV 137 Trial location of Wichita ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4759911.), filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Shawnee County Court File)(West, Craig)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Erickson v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Craig W. West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Taylor Erickson
Represented By: Matthew L. Bretz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?