Hervey v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Anthony Curtis Hervey and Curtis Anthony Hervey
Defendant: Veterans Affairs, Secretary of, United States Attorney, United States Attorney General, The and United States of America
Case Number: 5:2019cv04033
Filed: May 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Sam A Crow
Referring Judge: Angel D Mitchell
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2671
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 7 OBJECTION (Protest) to #6 Clerks Order Extending Time to Answer, by Curtis Anthony Hervey. (mls)
July 2, 2019 Filing 6 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 7/22/2019 for Defendants United States Attorney, United States Attorney General, United States of America, and Veterans Affairs, Secretary of to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 7/2/2019. (mls)
May 16, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Returned Executed via Certified Mail on 5/10/2019. Summons served on Secretary of Veterans Affairs. (jal) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/20/2019: #1 Return of Service) (jal).
May 14, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Returned Executed -- served by Certified Mail on 5/10/2019. Summons served on United States Attorney General. (jal)
May 10, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Returned Executed via Certified Mail on 5/8/2019. United States Attorney served on 5/8/2019, answer due 7/8/2019. (jal)
May 7, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Plaintiff Curtis Anthony Hervey is a registered pro se participant who will receive electronic notification in this case. (mg)
May 6, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Curtis Anthony Hervey. (jal)
May 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Topeka, filed by Curtis Anthony Hervey. (jal) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/8/2019: #1 Exhibits - Redacted) (jal).
May 6, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Veterans Affairs, Secretary of, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (jal)
May 6, 2019 FILING FEE PAID: in the amount of $400, receipt number T4631012798. (jal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hervey v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Curtis Hervey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis Anthony Hervey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Veterans Affairs, Secretary of
Represented By: Thomas Eugene Beall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Attorney
Represented By: Thomas Eugene Beall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Attorney General, The
Represented By: Thomas Eugene Beall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Thomas Eugene Beall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?