Long v. American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I.

Plaintiff: Arnold Long
Defendant: American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I.
Case Number: 5:2019cv04036
Filed: May 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Angel D Mitchell
Referring Judge: Holly L Teeter
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Arnold Long of Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures (Michel, Larry)
July 12, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Initial Rule 26 Disclosures by American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I.. (Meyer, Mark)
July 9, 2019 Filing 6 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Laurel A Michel on behalf of Arnold Long. (Michel, Laurel)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 7/23/2019 at 10:00 AM in Topeka Courtroom 470 (ADM) before Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 7/16/2019. Proposed Scheduling Order Deadline 7/16/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 6/17/2019. (ht)
June 14, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I..(Meyer, Mark)
May 31, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Arnold Long upon American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I. served on 5/28/2019, answer due 6/18/2019 (Michel, Larry)
May 17, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I. (issued to Attorney for service). (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (jal)
May 17, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Holly L. Teeter and Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jal)
May 17, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Arnold Long. (Michel, Larry)
May 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Topeka ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4809724.), filed by Arnold Long.(Michel, Larry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Long v. American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arnold Long
Represented By: Larry G. Michel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I.
Represented By: Mark E. Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?