McMahon v. Community Health Ministry, Inc.
Plaintiff: Samantha McMahon
Defendant: Community Health Ministry, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2019cv04070
Filed: August 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Teresa J James
Referring Judge: Holly L Teeter
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail (USM-285) by Samantha McMahon upon Community Health Ministry, Inc. served on 9/19/2019, answer due 10/10/2019 (kkw)
August 13, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Community Health Ministry, Inc. (issued to US Marshal for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ctv)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk shall issue Summons for Defendants. Service of the Summons and Complaint shall be made by a United States Marshal or Deputy Marshal or by a person specially appointed pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(c)(3). Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 8/13/2019.Mailed to pro se party Samantha McMahon by regular mail. (ydm)
August 6, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Samantha McMahon. NOTE - Access to document is restricted pursuant to the courts privacy policy. (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #1 Financial Affidavit) (jal)
August 6, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Samantha McMahon. (jal)
August 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (No Summons Issued) with trial location of Topeka, filed by Samantha McMahon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - KHRC Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - EEOC Dimissal and Notice of Rights, #3 Exhibit C - Position Summary) (jal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McMahon v. Community Health Ministry, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Community Health Ministry, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samantha McMahon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?