Zhang et al v. Federal Home Loan Bank of Topeka et al
Plaintiff: Steven Craig Heiland and Qinghua Zhang
Defendant: Michael Surface, Patrick Doran, Federal Home Loan Bank of Topeka, Amanda Kiefer and Mark E. Yardley
Case Number: 5:2019cv04073
Filed: August 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Sam A Crow
Referring Judge: Angel D Mitchell
2 Judge: Holly L Teeter
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Filing 23 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Steven Craig Heiland upon Mark E. Yardley served on 9/20/2019, answer due 10/11/2019. (kkw)
October 8, 2019 Filing 22 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Steven Craig Heiland upon Michael Surface served on 9/23/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. (kkw)
October 8, 2019 Filing 21 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Steven Craig Heiland upon Patrick Doran served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019. (kkw)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER. The court sua sponte vacates the scheduling conference that was previously set for October 9, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 10/8/2019. Mailed to pro se party Qinghua Zhang & Steven Craig Heiland by regular mail. (ht)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: Case reassigned to District Judge Sam A. Crow for all further proceedings. District Judge Holly L. Teeter no longer assigned to case. Signed by District Judge Holly L. Teeter on 9/27/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(md)
September 27, 2019 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #16 MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' Allegations. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge. (ht)
September 26, 2019 Filing 18 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Federal Home Loan Bank of Topeka identifying None as corporate parent . (Schuering, Emma)
September 26, 2019 Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Federal Home Loan Bank of Topeka.(Schuering, Emma)
September 26, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' Allegations by Defendants Patrick Doran, Federal Home Loan Bank of Topeka, Amanda Kiefer, Michael Surface, Mark E. Yardley (Schuering, Emma)
September 26, 2019 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Patrick Doran, Federal Home Loan Bank of Topeka, Amanda Kiefer, Michael Surface, Mark E. Yardley(Schuering, Emma)
September 26, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Patrick Doran, Federal Home Loan Bank of Topeka, Amanda Kiefer, Michael Surface, Mark E. Yardley (Schuering, Emma)
September 26, 2019 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #12 MOTION to Dismiss Party Patrick Doran, Amanda Kiefer, Michael Surface and Mark E. Yardley by Defendants Patrick Doran, Amanda Kiefer, Michael Surface, Mark E. Yardley(Schuering, Emma)
September 26, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss Party Patrick Doran, Amanda Kiefer, Michael Surface and Mark E. Yardley by Defendants Patrick Doran, Amanda Kiefer, Michael Surface, Mark E. Yardley (Schuering, Emma)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 10/9/2019 at 01:00 PM in Telephone ADM - CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749 ACCESS CODE 3977627 before Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 9/19/19. Mailed to pro se parties Qinghua Zhang & Steven Craig Heiland by regular mail (msb)
September 18, 2019 Filing 10 RETURN OF SERVICE of summons filed by Plaintiffs Steven Craig Heiland, Qinghua Zhang (msb)
September 11, 2019 Filing 9 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME to 9/26/19 for Defendants Amanda Kiefer, Mark E. Yardley, Federal Home Loan Bank of Topeka, Michael Surface, Patrick Doran to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 9/11/19. (msb)
September 10, 2019 Filing 8 (VIEW RESTRICTED - SEE DOCKET ENTRY 9 FOR CORRECT FILING) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendants Patrick Doran, Federal Home Loan Bank of Topeka, Amanda Kiefer, Michael Surface, Mark E. Yardley (referred to Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell) (Schuering, Emma) Modified text on 9/11/2019 (msb).
August 30, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Qinghua Zhang and Steven Craig Heiland upon Michael Surface, served on 8/22/2019, answer due 9/12/2019. (mls)
August 30, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Qinghua Zhang and Steven Craig Heiland upon Amanda Kiefer, served on 8/22/2019, answer due 9/12/2019. (mls)
August 30, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Qinghua Zhang and Steven Craig Heiland upon Patrick Doran, served on 8/22/2019, answer due 9/12/2019. (mls)
August 30, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Qinghua Zhang and Steven Craig Heiland upon Mark E. Yardley, served on 8/22/2019, answer due 9/12/2019. (mls)
August 30, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Qinghua Zhang and Steven Craig Heiland upon Federal Home Loan Bank of Topeka, served on 8/22/2019, answer due 9/12/2019. (mls)
August 19, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Patrick Doran, Federal Home Loan Bank of Topeka, Amanda Kiefer, Michael Surface, Mark E. Yardley. (issued as Returned to plaintiffs for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (jal)
August 19, 2019 FILING FEE PAID: in the amount of $ 400, receipt number T4631013091. (jal)
August 19, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Complaint by Plaintiffs Steven Craig Heiland, Qinghua Zhang. (jal)
August 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Topeka, filed by Qinghua Zhang, Steven Craig Heiland. (Attachments: #1 Dismissal and Notice of Rights - Zhang, #2 Dismissal and Notice of Rights - Heiland) (jal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zhang et al v. Federal Home Loan Bank of Topeka et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Surface
Represented By: Eric E. Packel
Represented By: Emma R. Schuering
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Doran
Represented By: Eric E. Packel
Represented By: Emma R. Schuering
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Home Loan Bank of Topeka
Represented By: Eric E. Packel
Represented By: Emma R. Schuering
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amanda Kiefer
Represented By: Eric E. Packel
Represented By: Emma R. Schuering
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark E. Yardley
Represented By: Eric E. Packel
Represented By: Emma R. Schuering
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Craig Heiland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Qinghua Zhang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?