Wingate v. Barkman Honey, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Dave Wingate
Defendant: Barkman Honey, LLC and Truesource Honey, LLC
Case Number: 5:2019cv04074
Filed: August 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: James P O'Hara
Referring Judge: Holly L Teeter
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2019 Filing 25 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #24 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Barkman Honey, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Chaffee-McClure, Zach)
October 25, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Barkman Honey, LLC (Chaffee-McClure, Zach)
October 25, 2019 Filing 23 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Barkman Honey, LLC identifying Barkman, Inc. as corporate parent . (Chaffee-McClure, Zach)
October 25, 2019 Filing 22 REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Defendant Truesource Honey, LLC re: #13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Lack of Personal Jurisdiction (Rathbun, Randall)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #20 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Elisabeth Kidder for Truesource Honey, LLC pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Unless already registered, pro hac vice counsel should register for electronic notification pursuant to the court's Administrative Procedures by completing a CM/ECF Electronic Filing Registration Form at http://www.ksd.uscourts.gov/. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 10/23/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (hw)
October 23, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION for attorney Elisabeth Kidder to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4957448.) by Defendant Truesource Honey, LLC (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 ECF Registration Form)(Rathbun, Randall)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #17 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Richard T. Rossier for Truesource Honey, LLC pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Unless already registered, pro hac vice counsel should register for electronic notification pursuant to the court's Administrative Procedures by completing a CM/ECF Electronic Filing Registration Form at http://www.ksd.uscourts.gov/. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 10/22/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (heo)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 INITIAL ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 12/12/2019 at 9:00 AM in KC Courtroom 223 (JPO) before Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara. Report of Parties Planning Meeting deadline 12/4/2019. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 12/4/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 10/22/19. (ss)
October 22, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for attorney Richard T. Rossier to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number BKSDC-4956075.) by Defendant Truesource Honey, LLC (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 ECF Registration Form)(Rathbun, Randall)
October 11, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Dave Wingate re #13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Lack of Personal Jurisdiction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1-4)(Gragson, James)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: Case reassigned to District Judge Holly L. Teeter for all further proceedings. U.S. District Senior Judge Sam A. Crow no longer assigned to case. Entered by District Judge Sam A. Crow on 9/24/19. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(msb)
September 23, 2019 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by Defendant Truesource Honey, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Rathbun, Randall)
September 23, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by Defendant Truesource Honey, LLC (Rathbun, Randall)
September 20, 2019 Filing 12 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Randall K. Rathbun on behalf of Truesource Honey, LLC (Rathbun, Randall)
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 unopposed motion for extension of time until October 25, 2019, for defendant Barkman Honey, LLC to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 9/11/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (amh)
September 11, 2019 Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell no longer assigned to case. Signed by deputy clerk on 9/11/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(ht)
September 10, 2019 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for extension of time to Answer or Move to Dismiss Complaint by Defendant Barkman Honey, LLC (Chaffee-McClure, Zach). Added MOTION to Dismiss on 9/11/2019 (msb).
September 5, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Dave Wingate upon Barkman Honey, LLC served on 9/3/2019, answer due 9/24/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Cert Mail, RRR)(Gragson, James)
August 30, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Barkman Honey, LLC, Truesource Honey, LLC. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (jal)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Kent A. Heitzinger for Dave Wingate pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Unless already registered, pro hac vice counsel should register for electronic notification pursuant to the court's Administrative Procedures by completing a CM/ECF Electronic Filing Registration Form at http://www.ksd.uscourts.gov/. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 8/28/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jal)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Terrence Buehler for Dave Wingate pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Unless already registered, pro hac vice counsel should register for electronic notification pursuant to the court's Administrative Procedures by completing a CM/ECF Electronic Filing Registration Form at http://www.ksd.uscourts.gov/. Entered by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 8/28/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (mls)
August 28, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for attorney Terrence Buehler to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4906052.) by Plaintiff Dave Wingate (referred to Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell) (Attachments: #1 ECF Registration Form Terrence Buehler, #2 Affidavit Terrence Buehler)(Gragson, James)
August 28, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for attorney Kent Heitzinger to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4905682.) by Plaintiff Dave Wingate (referred to Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell) (Attachments: #1 ECF Registration Form PHV Reg Form - Heitzinger, Kent, #2 Affidavit Affidavit - Heitzinger, Kent)(Gragson, James)
August 28, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Sam A. Crow and Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jal)
August 28, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Dave Wingate. (Gragson, James)
August 28, 2019 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Civil cover sheet is missing. The filing attorney is directed to correct the deficiency immediately.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jal)
August 27, 2019 Filing 2 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Dave Wingate - trial to be held in Topeka. (Gragson, James)
August 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Topeka ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4904895.), filed by Dave Wingate.(Gragson, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wingate v. Barkman Honey, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barkman Honey, LLC
Represented By: Zach Chaffee-McClure
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Truesource Honey, LLC
Represented By: Richard T. Rossier
Represented By: Randall K. Rathbun
Represented By: Elisabeth Kidder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dave Wingate
Represented By: James Phillip Gragson
Represented By: Kent A. Heitzinger
Represented By: Terrence Buehler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?