Armfield v. Sistrunk
Plaintiff: James G Armfield
Defendant: Danielle E Sistrunk
Case Number: 5:2019cv04082
Filed: September 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Sam A Crow
Referring Judge: Angel D Mitchell
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures by Danielle E Sistrunk. (Seibold, Christopher)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 11/15/2019 at 01:30 PM in Topeka Courtroom 470 (ADM) before Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell. Rule 26 Planning Conference Deadline 10/25/2019. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 11/8/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 10/10/2019. (ht)
September 19, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Petition by Danielle E Sistrunk.(Seibold, Christopher)
September 13, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Danielle E Sistrunk of Notice to State Court of Filing Notice of Removal (Seibold, Christopher)
September 13, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Sam A. Crow and Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (kkw)
September 13, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF SERVICE by Danielle Sistrunk of Notice of Filing Notice of Removal to Plaintiff (Seibold, Christopher)
September 13, 2019 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendant Danielle Sistrunk - trial to be held in Topeka. (Seibold, Christopher)
September 13, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Defendant Danielle Sistrunk. (Seibold, Christopher)
September 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Shawnee County District Court, case number 2019-cv-000569 Trial location of Topeka ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4919862.), filed by Danielle Sistrunk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Seibold, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Armfield v. Sistrunk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James G Armfield
Represented By: Bruce Alan Brumley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danielle E Sistrunk
Represented By: Christopher J. Seibold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?