Warren v. University of Illinois-Champaign/Urbana et al
Plaintiff: Kent Thomas Warren
Defendant: University of Illinois-Champaign/Urbana, University of Arizona-Tucson, Northern Arizona University-Flagstaff, Western Governors University-Utah and Southern Illinois University-Carbondale
Case Number: 5:2019cv04094
Filed: October 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Sam A Crow
Referring Judge: Angel D Mitchell
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying #4 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 11/25/2019. (mls)
November 25, 2019 Filing 6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that #5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Kent Thomas Warren be denied. (NOTE - Access to document is restricted pursuant to the courts privacy policy.) Objections to R&R due by 12/9/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 11/25/2019. (mls)
November 22, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to All Defendants. Returned to plaintiff for service. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (kkw)
November 12, 2019 FILING FEE PAID: in the amount of $400.00, receipt number T4631013327 (kkw)
October 28, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Kent Thomas Warren. NOTE - Access to document is restricted pursuant to the courts privacy policy (referred to Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell) (Attachments: #1 Financial Affidavit, #2 Envelope)(kkw)
October 17, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Plaintiff Kent Thomas Warren(referred to Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell) (kkw)
October 17, 2019 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Motion to proceed in forma pauperis is missing. The filing party/attorney is directed to correct the deficiency immediately.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (kkw)
October 17, 2019 Filing 3 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Plaintiff Kent Thomas Warren is a registered pro se participant who will receive electronic notification. (gw)
October 17, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Kent Thomas Warren. (kkw)
October 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (No Summons Issued) with trial location of Topeka, filed by Kent Thomas Warren.(kkw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Warren v. University of Illinois-Champaign/Urbana et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kent Thomas Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Illinois-Champaign/Urbana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Arizona-Tucson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northern Arizona University-Flagstaff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Governors University-Utah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Illinois University-Carbondale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?