United States of America v. Ranz et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Amy Lynn Ranz and Nicholas R. Ranz
Case Number: 5:2019cv04097
Filed: November 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: John W Broomes
Referring Judge: Teresa J James
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. Nicholas R. Ranz waiver sent on 11/5/2019, answer due 1/6/2020. (Macke, Sarah)
November 19, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Complaint, Notice of Lawsuit, Waiver of Summons by United States of America (Macke, Sarah)
November 5, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Complaint, Notice of Lawsuit, Waiver of Summons by United States of America (Macke, Sarah)
November 4, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff United States of America. (Macke, Sarah)
November 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Topeka, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Note, #2 Exhibit B - Mortgage, #3 Exhibit C - Agreement)(Macke, Sarah)
November 4, 2019 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge John W. Broomes and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (kkw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Ranz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy Lynn Ranz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas R. Ranz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Sarah Burch Macke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?