Allen v. Wichita, City of et al
Plaintiff: Mike Allen
Defendant: Wichita, City of and Cathy Eaton
Case Number: 5:2019cv04101
Filed: November 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Gwynne E Birzer
Referring Judge: Daniel D Crabtree
2 Judge: Kenneth G Gale
3 Judge: John W Lungstrum
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2019 Filing 18 CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT returned re Notice Re Pro Se Mailing of #16 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS addressed to Plaintiff Mike Allen. (jal)
December 16, 2019 MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #17 MOTION for Order. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(df)
December 14, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Order of Indigence by Plaintiff Mike Allen. (jal)
December 10, 2019 NOTICE Re: Pro Se Mailing. Document #15 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, #16 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #12 Amended Complaint filed by Mike Allen, #1 Complaint filed by Mike Allen mailed to plaintiff Mike Allen on 12/10/2019 by both regular mail and certified mail ; Certified Tracking Number 7019 0700 0000 5927 4261. (aw)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS of Dismissal to District Court re #1 Complaint and #12 Amended Complaint filed by Mike Allen. This document also serves as the MEMORANDUM & ORDER finding as moot #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and granting #13 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The document is included as two entries in the Court's docketing system for administrative/tracking purposes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 12/10/19. Mailed to pro se party Mike Allen by certified mail. (df)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER finding as moot #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and granting #13 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. This document also serves as the REPORT & RECOMMENDATION of DISMASSAL to the District Court. It is included as two entries in the Court's docketing system for administrative/tracking purposes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 12/10/19. Mailed to pro se party Mike Allen by certified mail. (df)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer no longer assigned to case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 12/6/19.Mailed to pro se party Mike Allen by regular mail. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(adc)
December 4, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Mike Allen. NOTE - Access to document is restricted pursuant to the courts privacy policy. (referred to Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer) (jal)
December 4, 2019 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Wichita, City of filed by Plaintiff Mike Allen. (Attachments: #1 Amended Civil Cover Sheet) (jal)
December 4, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Amendment to Correct the Terms of Appeal by Plaintiff Mike Allen. (jal)
November 18, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT returned re 8 Order addressed to Mike Allen (signed for/delivered on 11/15/2019). (mam)
November 18, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE to 8 Order and Amendment by Plaintiff Mike Allen. (ctv)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER. On 11/12/19, the Court sent a letter regarding deficiencies in Plaintiff's recent filings. The letter was sent by U.S. Mail and a copy is maintained in the chambers of the undersigned. Plaintiff must file an Amended Complaint on or before 12/6/19. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 11/12/19.Mailed to pro se party Mike Allen, 1301 S. Ida, Wichita, KS 67211 by certified mail; Certified Tracking Number: 7012 3050 0001 1190 3825.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(adc)
November 7, 2019 Filing 7 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Mike Allen. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jal)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF RECUSAL. District Judge John W. Lungstrum recused. Case reassigned to District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree for all further proceedings Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 11/06/2019.Mailed to pro se party Mike Allen 1301 S. Ida Wichita, KS 67211 by regular mail (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(ses)
November 6, 2019 Filing 5 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Mike Allen. (jal)
November 4, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis NOTE - Access to document is restricted pursuant to the courts privacy policy. by Plaintiff Mike Allen (referred to Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer) (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(ctv)
November 4, 2019 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Mike Allen - trial to be held in Topeka. (ctv)
November 4, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Mike Allen. (ctv)
November 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (No Summons Issued) with trial location of Topeka, filed by Mike Allen.(ctv)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allen v. Wichita, City of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wichita, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cathy Eaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mike Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?