Askew v. USP Leavenworth et al
Plaintiff: Leon Henderson Askew
Defendant: Unknown Employees, Unknown Staff, USP Leavenworth and Gregory (lnu)
Case Number: 5:2020cv03058
Filed: February 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Sam A Crow
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2020 Filing 4 RESPONSE to (Doc. 3 ) Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Leon Henderson Askew. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (smnd)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER ENTERED: Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis #2 is granted. The Court assesses an initial partial filing fee of $66.00, calculated under 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(1). Plaintiff is granted fourteen (14) days from receipt of this order to submit the fee. Any objection to this order must be filed on or before the date payment is due. The failure to pay the fee as directed may result in the dismissal of this matter without further notice. Plaintiff remains obligated to pay the remainder of the $350.00 filing fee. The agency having custody of plaintiff shall forward payments from plaintiff's account in installments calculated under 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(2). The clerk is to transmit a copy of this order to plaintiff, to the finance office at the institution where plaintiff is currently confined, and to the court's finance office. Entered by U.S. Senior District Judge Sam A. Crow on 02/20/20. Mailed to pro se party Leon Henderson Askew by regular mail. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (smnd)
February 19, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Leon Henderson Askew. (Attachments: #1 Inmate Account Statement) (smnd)
February 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (missing pages 5 & 6) filed by Plaintiff Leon Henderson Askew. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Envelope) (smnd) Modified text on 2/19/2020. (smnd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Askew v. USP Leavenworth et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leon Henderson Askew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Employees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Staff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USP Leavenworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory (lnu)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?