Jones v. Reiling et al
Plaintiff: Joseph Lee Jones
Defendant: Douglas County, Kansas, Commissioners of and (fnu) Reiling
Case Number: 5:2020cv03068
Filed: March 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Sam A Crow
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2020 Filing 8 JUDGMENT regarding Order #7 dismissing matter without prejudice. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 04/10/20. Mailed to pro se party Joseph Lee Jones by regular mail. (smnd)
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF DISMISSAL ENTERED: This matter is dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiff's motion to appoint counsel (Doc. #3 ) and motion for temporary injunctive relief (Doc. #4 ) are denied as moot. Signed by U.S. Senior District Judge Sam A. Crow on 04/10/20. Mailed to pro se party Joseph Lee Jones by regular mail. (smnd)
March 13, 2020 Filing 6 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Joseph Lee Jones re #5 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Attachments: #1 Document 7 in Case No. 20-3056-SAC, #2 Envelope) (smnd)
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER ENTERED: Plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Doc. #2 ) is denied. Plaintiff is granted to and including April 9, 2020, to submit the $400.00 filing fee to the clerk of the court. Signed by U.S. District Judge Sam A. Crow on 03/09/20. Mailed to pro se party Joseph Lee Jones by regular mail. (smnd)
March 4, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Temporary Injunctive Relief by Plaintiff Joseph Lee Jones. (smnd)
March 4, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Plaintiff Joseph Lee Jones. (smnd)
March 4, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Joseph Lee Jones. (Attachments: #1 Resident History Report) (smnd)
March 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Joseph Lee Jones. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Envelope) (smnd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Reiling et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas County, Kansas, Commissioners of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: (fnu) Reiling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Lee Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?