Sutton v. Sledd et al
Plaintiff: Kyle J. Sutton
Defendant: James Spies, Sara Toms, Bryanna Hanschu, Wyandotte County Courthouse, Wyandotte County Sheriff's Department, Donald Ash, (fnu) Terazza, A. M., Jacob Sledd, (fnu) (lnu), Unified Government of Wyandotte County, Kansas City, Kansas Police Department, Darrell L. Smith and Wyandotte County District Attorney's Office
Case Number: 5:2020cv03105
Filed: April 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Sam A Crow
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2020 Filing 15 SUBPOENA EXHIBITS AFFIDAVIT by Plaintiff Kyle J. Sutton. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (smnd)
June 1, 2020 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT by Plaintiff Kyle J. Sutton. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (smnd)
May 28, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Show Interference of Court Process by Plaintiff Kyle J. Sutton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Envelope) (smnd)
May 20, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Access to a Law Library by Plaintiff Kyle J. Sutton. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (smnd)
May 18, 2020 Filing 11 DUE PROCESS AND BLOCKED ACCESS TO THE COURTS COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Kyle J. Sutton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope) (smnd)
May 7, 2020 Filing 10 DECLARATION by Plaintiff Kyle J. Sutton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-C, #2 Envelope) (smnd)
April 27, 2020 Filing 9 WYANDOTTE COUNTY RETALIATION COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Kyle J. Sutton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Envelope) (smnd)
April 27, 2020 Filing 8 EXHIBIT IN SUPPORT of #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Kyle J. Sutton. (Attachments: #1 Envelopes) (smnd)
April 23, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Amend Relief on #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Kyle J. Sutton. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (smnd)
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER ENTERED: Plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed without prepayment of fees #2 is granted because plaintiff's trust fund account statement shows that he has insufficient funds to pay an initial partial filing fee. Notwithstanding this grant of leave, plaintiff is required to pay the full amount of the filing fee and is hereby assessed $350.00. Plaintiff is required to make monthly payments of 20 percent of the preceding month's income credited to the prisoner's account. The agency having custody of plaintiff shall forward payments from the prisoner's account to the clerk of the court each time the amount in the account exceeds $10.00 until the filing fees are paid. 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(2). The clerk is to transmit a copy of this order to plaintiff, to the finance office at the institution where plaintiff is currently confined, and to the court's finance office. Entered by U.S. Senior District Judge Sam A. Crow on 04/22/20. Mailed to pro se party Kyle J. Sutton by regular mail. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (smnd)
April 22, 2020 Filing 5 SUPPLEMENT to #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Kyle J. Sutton. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (smnd)
April 13, 2020 Filing 4 EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT of #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Kyle J. Sutton. (Attachments: #1 Envelopes) (smnd)
April 8, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis mailed to pro se party Kyle J. Sutton by regular mail. Response deadline 5/8/2020. (smnd)
April 8, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Kyle J. Sutton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Envelope) (smnd)
April 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Kyle J. Sutton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Letter to Judge Sam Crow, #3 Envelopes) (smnd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sutton v. Sledd et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Spies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sara Toms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryanna Hanschu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyandotte County Courthouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyandotte County Sheriff's Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Ash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: (fnu) Terazza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. M.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacob Sledd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: (fnu) (lnu)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unified Government of Wyandotte County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kansas City, Kansas Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darrell L. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyandotte County District Attorney's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyle J. Sutton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?