Byers v. Smith
Case Number: 5:2020cv03107
Filed: May 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Office: Topeka Office
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER ENTERED: Smith's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 18 ) is granted. The Court dismisses the claims without prejudice. This case is closed. Byers's Motion for Extension of Time as to Order to Show Cause (Doc. 27 ) is denied. Signed by District Judge Holly L. Teeter on 10/15/20. Mailed to pro se party Jermelle Byers by certified mail; Certified Tracking Number: 70102780000319281496. (smnd) Modified text to add certified tracking number on 10/15/2020. (smnd)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER denying without prejudice 19 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 8/19/2020. Mailed to pro se party Jermelle Byers by regular mail. (ts)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying without prejudice 5 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 5/27/2020. Mailed to pro se party Jermelle Byers by regular mail. (ts)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Byers v. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?