Kinsey v. Wyandotte County Unified Government et al
Plaintiff: Brandon Arlander Kinsey
Defendant: Sara Toms, Wyandotte County Unified Government, Allen County Sheriff's Office, (fnu) Patrick, Jeffrey S. Fewell and (fnu) Roland
Case Number: 5:2020cv03198
Filed: July 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Sam A Crow
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2020 Filing 11 RETURN mail received re #8 Order of Dismissal and #9 Judgment addressed to Brandon Plaintiff Arlander Kinsey (Return to Sender/Refused/Unable to Forward); Remailed to Plaintiff Kinsey at Fulton Reception and Diagnostic Center on 08/27/20. (smnd)
August 27, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Pursuant to Plaintiff Brandon Arlander Kinsey's notice of change of address, copies of the #8 Order of Dismissal and #9 Judgment were remailed to him at the Fulton Reception and Diagnostic Center, as well as a current docket sheet. (smnd)
August 27, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Change of Address by Plaintiff Brandon Arlander Kinsey, #1036709: now at Fulton Reception and Diagnostic Center, P.O. Box 190, State Route O, Fulton, Missouri 65251. (Document written in pencil and difficult to scan.) (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (smnd)
August 25, 2020 Filing 9 JUDGMENT regarding Order #8 dismissing matter without prejudice. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 08/25/20. Mailed to pro se party Brandon Arlander Kinsey by regular mail. (smnd)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF DISMISSAL ENTERED: This matter is dismissed without prejudice for lack of prosecution. Signed by U.S. Senior District Judge Sam A. Crow on 08/25/20. Mailed to pro se party Brandon Arlander Kinsey by regular mail. (smnd)
August 17, 2020 Filing 7 RETURN mail received re #5 Order to Show Cause addressed to Plaintiff Brandon Arlander Kinsey (Return to Sender/Refused/Unable to Forward; Not Remailed. (smnd)
August 11, 2020 Filing 6 RETURN mail received re (Doc. 3 ) Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis addressed to Plaintiff Brandon Arlander Kinsey (Return to Sender/Refused/Unable to Forward); Not Remailed. (smnd)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ENTERED: Plaintiff is granted to and including August 20, 2020, to show cause why this matter should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. The failure to file a timely response may result in the dismissal of this action without additional notice. A copy of this order shall be mailed to plaintiff at his last known address. Signed by U.S. Senior District Judge Sam A. Crow on 08/06/20. Mailed to pro se party Brandon Arlander Kinsey by regular mail. (smnd)
August 5, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE by Johnson County Sheriff of Plaintiff Kinsey's Release to MDOC as of 07/23/20. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (smnd)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER ENTERED: Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis #2 is granted. The Court assesses an initial partial filing fee of $33.00, calculated under 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(1). Plaintiff is granted to and including August 5, 2020, to submit the fee. Any objection to this order must be filed on or before the date payment is due. The failure to pay the fee as directed may result in the dismissal of this matter without further notice. Plaintiff remains obligated to pay the remainder of the $350.00 filing fee. The agency having custody of plaintiff shall forward payments from plaintiff's account in installments calculated under 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(2). The clerk is to transmit a copy of this order to plaintiff, to the finance office at the institution where plaintiff is currently confined, and to the court's finance office. Entered by U.S. Senior District Judge Sam A. Crow on 07/22/20. Mailed to pro se party Brandon Arlander Kinsey by regular mail. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (smnd)
July 22, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Brandon Arlander Kinsey. (Attachments: #1 Inmate Account Statement) (smnd)
July 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Brandon Arlander Kinsey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Envelope) (smnd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kinsey v. Wyandotte County Unified Government et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sara Toms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyandotte County Unified Government
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allen County Sheriff's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: (fnu) Patrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey S. Fewell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: (fnu) Roland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Arlander Kinsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?