Bellamy (ID 53454) v. Cline et al
Plaintiff: Ronnie Allen Bellamy, Jr.
Defendant: John Cannon, (fnu) Does 9-11, Dylan Darter, (fnu) Does 1-4, Sam Cline, Dustin Randolph, Ron Baker, James Gift, Nicolaus Ball, Maria Bos, Alex McCollough, (fnu) Does 4-8, Collette Winklehaven, (fnu) Rainey and Stuart Bailey
Case Number: 5:2020cv03229
Filed: September 11, 2020
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Sam A Crow
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION for Preliminary Restraining Order by Plaintiff Ronnie Allen Bellamy, Jr. (smnd)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 RESPONSE (titled Submission of Documentation) by Plaintiff Ronnie Allen Bellamy, Jr re 11 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (jal)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order INITIAL PARTIAL FILING FEE PAID on 10/16/2020. Receipt number T4631014219, in the amount of $ 17.50. (mls)
October 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Ronnie Allen Bellamy, Jr. re (Doc. 11) Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-B) (smnd)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order DOCKET ANNOTATION: Telephone call from Plaintiff Bellamy regarding (Doc. 11) Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; the KDOC has withdrawn two payments ($17.50 and $400.00) from his account. Plaintiff Bellamy was advised that payments have been delayed from the KDOC, and if an overpayment is received, it will be returned to him. (smnd)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER ENTERED: Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis #3 is granted. The Court assesses an initial partial filing fee of $17.50, calculated under 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(1). Plaintiff is granted to and including October 9, 2020, to submit the fee. Any objection to this order must be filed on or before the date payment is due. The failure to pay the fee as directed may result in the dismissal of this matter without further notice. Plaintiff remains obligated to pay the remainder of the $350.00 filing fee. The agency having custody of plaintiff shall forward payments from plaintiff's account in installments calculated under 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(2). The clerk is to transmit a copy of this order to plaintiff, to the finance office at the institution where plaintiff is currently confined, and to the court's finance office. Signed by U.S. Senior District Judge Sam A. Crow on 09/25/20. Mailed to pro se party Ronnie Allen Bellamy, Jr. by regular mail. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (smnd)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SUPPLEMENT to #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Ronnie Allen Bellamy, Jr. (smnd)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 RESPONSE to #7 Notice of Deficiency by Plaintiff Ronnie Allen Bellamy, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (smnd)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 EXHIBIT D IN SUPPORT of #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Ronnie Allen Bellamy, Jr. (smnd)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis mailed to pro se party Ronnie Allen Bellamy, Jr. by regular mail. Response deadline 10/22/2020. (smnd)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION to Supplement #1 Complaint and MOTION for Martinez Report by Plaintiff Ronnie Allen Bellamy, Jr. (smnd)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Ronnie Allen Bellamy, Jr. (smnd)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Plaintiff Ronnie Allen Bellamy, Jr. (smnd)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Ronnie Allen Bellamy, Jr. (smnd)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT of #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Ronnie Allen Bellamy, Jr. (smnd)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Ronnie Allen Bellamy, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Inmate Assistance and Request Court to Appoint Counsel) (smnd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bellamy (ID 53454) v. Cline et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Cannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: (fnu) Does 9-11
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dylan Darter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: (fnu) Does 1-4
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam Cline
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dustin Randolph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Gift
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicolaus Ball
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria Bos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex McCollough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: (fnu) Does 4-8
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Collette Winklehaven
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: (fnu) Rainey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stuart Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronnie Allen Bellamy, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?