Roeder (ID 65192) v. Schnurr
Petitioner: Scott P. Roeder
Respondent: Dan Schnurr
Case Number: 5:2020cv03275
Filed: November 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Sam A Crow
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER ENTERED: Petitioner's motion to supplement (Doc. #4 ) and emergency motion for stay (Doc. #8 ) are denied. Signed by U.S. Senior District Judge Sam A. Crow on 12/23/20. Mailed to pro se party Scott P. Roeder by regular mail. (smnd)
December 10, 2020 Filing 9 RESPONSE re #5 Memorandum and Order by Petitioner Scott P. Roeder. (jal) Modified text on 12/14/2020. (smnd)
December 7, 2020 Filing 8 EMERGENCY MOTION for Stay of Execution by Petitioner Scott P. Roeder. (smnd)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER ENTERED: Respondent's motion (Doc. #6 ) is granted and the time for filing is extended to and including February 8, 2021. Signed by District Judge Sam A. Crow on 12/03/20. Mailed to pro se party Scott P. Roeder by regular mail. (smnd)
December 3, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Respondent Dan Schnurr (Ailslieger, Kristafer)
November 20, 2020 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ENTERED: Petitioner's motion for an extension of time (Doc. #3 ) is granted, and the time for filing a traverse is extended to 60 days. Petitioner is granted to and including December 11, 2020, to show cause why his defaulted claim should be considered by the Court. Signed by U.S. Senior District Judge Sam A. Crow on 11/20/2020. Mailed to pro se party Scott P. Roeder by regular mail. (jal)
November 19, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Supplement Petition by Petitioner Scott P. Roeder. (jal) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/20/2020: #1 Additional Pages for Motion) (jal).
November 17, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #2 Order to Show Cause by Petitioner Scott P. Roeder. (smnd)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ENTERED: Respondent shall show cause within thirty (30) days from the date of this order why the writ should not be granted. Petitioner is granted thirty (30) days after receipt by him of a copy of respondent's answer and return to file a traverse thereto, admitting or denying, under oath, all factual allegations therein contained. Signed by District Judge Sam A. Crow on 11/9/2020. Mailed to pro se party Scott P. Roeder by regular mail; e-mailed to Attorney General for the State of Kansas. (jal)
November 4, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS filed by Petitioner Scott P. Roeder. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-C, #2 Envelope) (smnd)
November 4, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Plaintiff Scott P. Roeder submitted the #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus for filing via U.S. Mail. Notice was sent to Plaintiff Roeder stating he is incarcerated in a facility with mandatory electronic filing and should follow instructions available at the facility for transmitting pleadings electronically to the court. (smnd)
November 4, 2020 FILING FEE PAID in the amount of $5.00, receipt number T4631014289. (smnd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roeder (ID 65192) v. Schnurr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Dan Schnurr
Represented By: Kristafer R. Ailslieger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Scott P. Roeder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?