BNSF Railway Company et al v. Department of Revenue, Kansas, State of, et al
Plaintiff: Norfolk Southern Railway Company, St. Joseph & Grand Island Railway Company, The, Nebraska, Kansas & Colorado Railnet, Kansas & Oklahoma Railroad, L.L.C., Kansas City Southern Railway Company, The, Wichita Union Terminal Railway Company, Union Pacific/Missouri Pacific Railroad Company, BNSF Railway Company, South Kansas & Oklahoma Railroad, L.L.C., Cimarron Valley Railroad, LC, Kansas City Terminal Railway Company and Kyle Railroad Company
Defendant: Department of Revenue, Kansas, State of, David N. Harper and Mark A. Burghart
Case Number: 5:2020cv04026
Filed: May 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: John W Broomes
Referring Judge: Angel D Mitchell
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 49:11503
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 7, 2020 Civil Case Terminated per #7 /JWB chambers.(mam)
June 19, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF CANCELLED HEARING: Non-Evidentiary Hearing June 29, 2020, at 1:00 p.m. cancelled. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jmr)
May 28, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Hearing: THIS IS AN OFFICIAL NOTICE FOR THIS HEARING (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) Non Evidentiary Hearing set for 6/29/2020 at 01:00 PM by Telephone JWB - CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749 ACCESS CODE 4983860 before District Judge John W. Broomes. (jmr)
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER ENJOINING ASSESSMENT, LEVY AND COLLECTION OF DISCRIMINATORY TAXES. Signed by District Judge John W. Broomes on 5/28/2020. (mam)
May 28, 2020 Filing 6 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before District Judge John W. Broomes: STATUS CONFERENCE held on 5/28/2020. (Court Reporter Jana McKinney.) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jmr)
May 26, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Hearing: THIS IS AN OFFICIAL NOTICE FOR THIS HEARING (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) Status Conference set for 5/28/2020 at 01:00 PM by Telephone JWB - CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749 ACCESS CODE 4983860 before District Judge John W. Broomes. (jmr)
May 22, 2020 Filing 4 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Shelley M. Woodard on behalf of All Defendants. (Woodard, Shelley)
May 21, 2020 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge John W. Broomes and Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (kkw)
May 21, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiffs BNSF Railway Company, Cimarron Valley Railroad, L.C., Kansas & Oklahoma Railroad LLC, Kansas City Southern Railway Company, The, Kansas City Terminal Railway Company, Kyle Railroad Company, Nebraska, Kansas & Colorado Railnet, Norfolk Southern Railway Company, South Kansas & Oklahoma Railroad, LLC, St. Joseph & Grand Island Railway Company, The, Union Pacific/Missouri Pacific Railroad Company, Wichita Union Terminal Railway Company. (Alderson, Alan)
May 21, 2020 Filing 2 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiffs BNSF Railway Company, Cimarron Valley Railroad, L.C., Kansas & Oklahoma Railroad LLC, Kansas City Southern Railway Company, The, Kansas City Terminal Railway Company, Kyle Railroad Company, Nebraska, Kansas & Colorado Railnet, Norfolk Southern Railway Company, South Kansas & Oklahoma Railroad, LLC, St. Joseph & Grand Island Railway Company, The, Union Pacific/Missouri Pacific Railroad Company, Wichita Union Terminal Railway Company - trial to be held in Topeka. (Alderson, Alan)
May 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Topeka ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5147734.), filed by Nebraska, Kansas & Colorado Railnet, Union Pacific/Missouri Pacific Railroad Company, Kansas & Oklahoma Railroad LLC, Norfolk Southern Railway Company, Kansas City Southern Railway Company, The, Wichita Union Terminal Railway Company, Cimarron Valley Railroad, L.C., South Kansas & Oklahoma Railroad, LLC, BNSF Railway Company, Kansas City Terminal Railway Company, St. Joseph & Grand Island Railway Company, The, Kyle Railroad Company.(Alderson, Alan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BNSF Railway Company et al v. Department of Revenue, Kansas, State of, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Revenue, Kansas, State of
Represented By: Shelley M. Woodard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David N. Harper
Represented By: Shelley M. Woodard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark A. Burghart
Represented By: Shelley M. Woodard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Represented By: Alan F. Alderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: St. Joseph & Grand Island Railway Company, The
Represented By: Alan F. Alderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nebraska, Kansas & Colorado Railnet
Represented By: Alan F. Alderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kansas & Oklahoma Railroad, L.L.C.
Represented By: Alan F. Alderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kansas City Southern Railway Company, The
Represented By: Alan F. Alderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wichita Union Terminal Railway Company
Represented By: Alan F. Alderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Union Pacific/Missouri Pacific Railroad Company
Represented By: Alan F. Alderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BNSF Railway Company
Represented By: Alan F. Alderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: South Kansas & Oklahoma Railroad, L.L.C.
Represented By: Alan F. Alderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cimarron Valley Railroad, LC
Represented By: Alan F. Alderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kansas City Terminal Railway Company
Represented By: Alan F. Alderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyle Railroad Company
Represented By: Alan F. Alderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?