White Prompt, Inc. v. David A. Kraft & Associates, LLC et al
Plaintiff: White Prompt, Inc.
Defendant: David A. Kraft & Associates, LLC, C2C Resources, LLC and C2C Resources, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2020cv04030
Filed: June 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Eric F Melgren
Referring Judge: James P O'Hara
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #25 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Whitney L. White for C2C Resources, Inc. pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 7/28/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ydm)
July 28, 2020 Filing 25 MOTION for attorney Whitney L. White to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5209987.) by Defendant C2C Resources, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit)(Ware, Mark)
July 22, 2020 Filing 24 DEFENDANT C2C RESOURCES, LLC'S ANSWER to Complaint (AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES) by C2C Resources, Inc..(Ware, Mark)
July 22, 2020 Filing 23 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by C2C Resources, Inc. identifying None as corporate parent . (Ware, Mark)
July 22, 2020 Filing 22 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Mark David Ware on behalf of C2C Resources, Inc.. (Ware, Mark)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. By August 3, 2020, the parties shall file a joint status report, with affidavits attached, demonstrating the citizenship of each of the parties and showing cause why this case should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 7/20/20. (jc)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 INITIAL ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 9/3/2020 at 11:00 AM by Telephone before Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara. Report of Parties Planning Meeting deadline 8/25/2020. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 8/25/2020. All parties and counsel participating in this phone conference are directed to dial the conference center line 888-363-4749, using access code 8914911 to join the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 7/20/2020. (ss)
July 13, 2020 Filing 19 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by David A. Kraft & Associates, LLC identifying None as corporate parent . (Dodig, Michael)
July 13, 2020 Filing 18 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Michael S. Dodig on behalf of David A. Kraft & Associates, LLC. (Dodig, Michael)
July 13, 2020 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint by David A. Kraft & Associates, LLC.(Dodig, Michael)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 defendant C2C Resources, Inc.'s unopposed motion for extension of time. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's complaint by July 22, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 6/30/20. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jc)
June 30, 2020 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File RESPONSE as to #1 Complaint (attorney) by Defendant C2C Resources, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Ware, Mark)
June 29, 2020 Filing 14 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 7/13/2020 for Defendant David A. Kraft & Associates, LLC to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 6/29/2020. (kkw)
June 16, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail (Federal Express) by White Prompt, Inc. upon C2C Resources, Inc. served on 6/10/2020, answer due 7/1/2020 (Weslander, J.)
June 16, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail (Federal Express) by White Prompt, Inc. upon David A. Kraft & Associates, LLC served on 6/9/2020, answer due 6/30/2020 (Weslander, J.)
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Thomas H. Kramer for White Prompt, Inc. pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 6/5/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ydm)
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Sean T. O'Kelly for White Prompt, Inc. pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 6/5/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ydm)
June 5, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for attorney Thomas H. Kramer to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5160180.) by Plaintiff White Prompt, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #2 ECF Registration Form)(Weslander, J.)
June 5, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for attorney Sean T. O'Kelly to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5160175.) by Plaintiff White Prompt, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit in Support of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #2 ECF Registration Form ECF Registration Form)(Weslander, J.)
June 5, 2020 SUMMONS ISSUED as to David A. Kraft & Associates, LLC. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (kkw)
June 5, 2020 SUMMONS ISSUED as to C2C Resources, Inc.. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (kkw)
June 3, 2020 Filing 7 Letter to attorneys Thomas H. Kramer and Sean T. O'Kelly regarding admission requirements for the District of Kansas. Letter delivered via NEF to both attorneys. (kkw)
June 3, 2020 Filing 6 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Katherine E. Marples Simpson on behalf of White Prompt, Inc.. (Marples Simpson, Katherine)
June 2, 2020 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Eric F. Melgren and Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (kkw)
June 2, 2020 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by White Prompt, Inc. identifying None as corporate parent . (Weslander, J.)
June 2, 2020 Filing 4 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by J. Eric Weslander on behalf of White Prompt, Inc.. (Weslander, J.)
June 2, 2020 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff White Prompt, Inc. - trial to be held in Topeka. (Weslander, J.)
June 2, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff White Prompt, Inc.. (Weslander, J.)
June 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Topeka ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5157752.), filed by White Prompt, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Weslander, J.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White Prompt, Inc. v. David A. Kraft & Associates, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David A. Kraft & Associates, LLC
Represented By: Michael S. Dodig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C2C Resources, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C2C Resources, Inc.
Represented By: Whitney L. White
Represented By: Mark David Ware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: White Prompt, Inc.
Represented By: J. Eric Weslander
Represented By: Sean T. O'Kelly
Represented By: Thomas H. Kramer
Represented By: Katherine E. Marples Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?