Blain v. Wyandotte County Detention Center
Plaintiff: Julia Blain
Defendant: Wyandotte County Detention Center and Correct Care
Case Number: 5:2020cv04043
Filed: August 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: John W Broomes
Referring Judge: Daniel D Crabtree
2 Judge: Teresa J James
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2020 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Wyandotte County Detention Center (issued to US Marshal for service). (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (jsh)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that no later than October 23, 2020, Plaintiff shall provide the Clerk's office with a complete mailing address for service upon defendant Correct Care. Signed by Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James on 9/25/2020. Mailed to pro se party Julia Blain by regular mail. (hw)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF RECUSAL. District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree recused. Case reassigned to District Judge John W. Broomes for all further proceedings. Signed by District Judge Daniel D. Crabtree on 08/17/2020. Mailed to pro se party Julia Blain by regular mail. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(mig)
August 14, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Plaintiff Julia Blain (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (kkw)
August 14, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Julia Blain. NOTE - Access to document is restricted pursuant to the courts privacy policy. (referred to Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Financial Status)(kkw)
August 14, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Julia Blain. (kkw)
August 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (No Summons Issued) with trial location of Topeka, filed by Julia Blain.(kkw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blain v. Wyandotte County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julia Blain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyandotte County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correct Care
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?