Wieslander v. Barragan
Plaintiff: Megan Wieslander
Defendant: Hazel Loruama Barragan
Case Number: 5:2020cv04061
Filed: October 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: James P O'Hara
Referring Judge: Julie A Robinson
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 24, 2020 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Initial Rule 26 Disclosure by Megan Wieslander. (White, Gary)
November 24, 2020 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Initial Rule 26 Disclosures by Hazel Loruama Barragan. (Hobbs, Michael)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER STRIKING the planning report ECF No. #8 . The planning report is to be emailed to chambers in both word and pdf per the initial scheduling order ECF No. #7 . Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 11/16/2020. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(ss)
November 16, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Report of Parties' Planning Conference by Hazel Loruama Barragan (Hobbs, Michael)
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 12/10/2020 at 9:00 AM by Telephone before Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara. Report of Parties Planning Meeting deadline 11/24/2020. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 11/24/2020. parties and counsel participating in this phone conference are directed to dial the conference center line 888-363-4749, using access code 8914911 to join the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 11/3/2020. (ss)
November 2, 2020 Filing 6 DEMAND FOR TRIAL BY JURY by Hazel Loruama Barragan. (Hobbs, Michael)
November 2, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Hazel Loruama Barragan.(Hobbs, Michael)
October 20, 2020 Filing 4 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Bradley S. Russell on behalf of Hazel Loruama Barragan. (Russell, Bradley)
October 6, 2020 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson and Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jsh)
October 2, 2020 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Megan Wieslander - trial to be held in Kansas City. (White, Gary)
October 2, 2020 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Designation of place of trial document is missing. The filing party/attorney is directed to correct the deficiency immediately by filing a designation of place of trial pleading. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jsh)
October 1, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with trial location of Topeka ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5275063.), filed by Megan Wieslander.(White, Gary)
October 1, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Megan Wieslander. (White, Gary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wieslander v. Barragan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Megan Wieslander
Represented By: Gary D. White, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hazel Loruama Barragan
Represented By: Michael K. Hobbs
Represented By: Bradley S. Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?