McLemore et al v. Miller et al
Plaintiff: James Laughlin, Jeffrey L. McLemore and Joshua Downey
Defendant: Ellen Mitchell, Kaitlin Carter, Jeffery Ebel, Stan Fruits, (fnu) Ahlstadt, Tina Miller, Rodney Orr, Angie Finch, Kevin Shankles, Roger Soldan and Benjiman Hill
Case Number: 5:2021cv03001
Filed: January 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Sam A Crow
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Change of Address by Plaintiff Jeffrey L. McLemore: now at 1217 E. Iron Street, Salina, Kansas 67401. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (smnd)
February 5, 2021 INITIAL PARTIAL FILING FEE PAID on 2/5/2021. Receipt number T4631014493, in the amount of $1.06. (jsh)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER ENTERED: Plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed without prepayment of fees #4 is granted because plaintiff's trust fund account statement shows that he has insufficient funds to pay an initial partial filing fee. Notwithstanding this grant of leave, plaintiff is required to pay the full amount of the filing fee and is hereby assessed $350.00. Plaintiff is required to make monthly payments of 20 percent of the preceding month's income credited to the prisoner's account. The agency having custody of plaintiff shall forward payments from the prisoner's account to the clerk of the court each time the amount in the account exceeds $10.00 until the filing fees are paid. 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(2). The clerk is to transmit a copy of this order to plaintiff, to the finance office at the institution where plaintiff is currently confined, and to the court's finance office. Entered by U.S. Senior District Judge Sam A. Crow on 01/22/21. Mailed to pro se party Joshua Downey by regular mail. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (smnd)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER ENTERED: Plaintiff's motions for leave to proceed without prepayment of fees #3 & #11 are granted because plaintiff's trust fund account statement shows that he has insufficient funds to pay an initial partial filing fee. Notwithstanding this grant of leave, plaintiff is required to pay the full amount of the filing fee and is hereby assessed $350.00. Plaintiff is required to make monthly payments of 20 percent of the preceding month's income credited to the prisoner's account. The agency having custody of plaintiff shall forward payments from the prisoner's account to the clerk of the court each time the amount in the account exceeds $10.00 until the filing fees are paid. 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(2). The clerk is to transmit a copy of this order to plaintiff, to the finance office at the institution where plaintiff is currently confined, and to the court's finance office. Entered by U.S. Senior District Judge Sam A. Crow on 01/22/21. Mailed to pro se party James Laughlin by regular mail. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (smnd)
January 21, 2021 Filing 12 SUPPLEMENT (Inmate Account History) to #4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Joshua Downey. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jal)
January 21, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff James Laughlin. (Attachments: #1 Inmate Account History, #2 Envelope) (jal)
January 20, 2021 PARTIAL FILING FEE PAID on 1/19/2021. Receipt number T4631014407, in the amount of $ 7.44. (jal)
January 19, 2021 Filing 10 RESPONSE (titled Motion Regarding initial partial filing fee) by Plaintiff Jeffrey L. McLemore re 9 Order. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jal)
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER ENTERED: Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis #2 is granted. The Court assesses an initial partial filing fee of $8.50, calculated under 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(1). Plaintiff is granted to and including January 22, 2021, to submit the fee. Any objection to this order must be filed on or before the date payment is due. The failure to pay the fee as directed may result in the dismissal of this matter without further notice. Plaintiff remains obligated to pay the remainder of the $350.00 filing fee. The agency having custody of plaintiff shall forward payments from plaintiff's account in installments calculated under 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(2). The clerk is to transmit a copy of this order to plaintiff, to the finance office at the institution where plaintiff is currently confined, and to the court's finance office. Entered by U.S. Senior District Judge Sam A. Crow on 01/08/21. Mailed to pro se party Jeffrey L. McLemore by regular mail. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (smnd)
January 8, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re #4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis mailed to pro se party Joshua Downey by regular mail. Response deadline 2/8/2021. (smnd)
January 8, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis mailed to pro se party James Laughlin by regular mail. Response deadline 2/8/2021. (smnd)
January 5, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Injunction by Plaintiff Jeffrey L. McLemore. (Attachments: #1 Letter to Clerk, #2 Envelope) (smnd)
January 5, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Injunction by Plaintiff Jeffrey L. McLemore. (Attachments: #1 Letter to Clerk, #2 Envelope) (smnd)
January 5, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Joshua Downey. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (smnd)
January 5, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff James Laughlin. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (smnd)
January 5, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Jeffrey L. McLemore. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (smnd)
January 5, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiffs Joshua Downey, James Laughlin and Jeffrey L. McLemore. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Letter to Clerk, #3 Envelope) (smnd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McLemore et al v. Miller et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ellen Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaitlin Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffery Ebel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stan Fruits
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: (fnu) Ahlstadt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tina Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rodney Orr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angie Finch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Shankles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger Soldan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjiman Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Laughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey L. McLemore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Downey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?