Brown v. Johnston
Petitioner: David Brown
Respondent: Michael A. Johnston
Case Number: 5:2021cv03010
Filed: January 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: John W Lungstrum
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2021 Filing 13 EXHIBIT(S) IN SUPPORT of #12 Response to Habeas Petition, by Respondent Michael A. Johnston . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Gessner Declaration - Exhibit D, #2 Exhibit Harms Declaration - Exhibit E, #3 Exhibit DeVlamnick - Exhibit I)(Maag, Jared) Modified title on 2/19/2021 (ca).
February 18, 2021 Filing 12 ANSWER AND RETURN - RESPONSE to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Michael A. Johnston. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J) (Maag, Jared) Modified on 2/18/2021 to remove duplicate word with Exhibits (ca).
February 18, 2021 DOCKET ANNOTATION: A copy of the #9 Memorandum and Order was mailed to Petitioner David Brown at FCI - Berlin, P.O. Box 9000, Berlin, New Hampshire 03570. (smnd)
February 18, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Change of Address by Petitioner David Brown, #17762-035: FCI - Berlin, P.O. Box 9000, Berlin, New Hampshire 03570. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (smnd)
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 DISREGARED AS FILED IN WRONG CASE -- MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ENTERED: The petition for habeas corpus is denied. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 02/18/21. Mailed to pro se party Henry Rivera Rodriguez by regular mail. (smnd) Modified text on 2/18/2021. (smnd)
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ENTERED: Petitioner's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Doc. #4 ) is denied. The deadline for Petitioner to file his traverse is extended to May 7, 2021. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 02/18/21. Mailed to pro se party David Brown at USDB Leavenworth and Oklahoma City FTC by regular mail. (smnd)
February 5, 2021 Filing 8 RESPONSE by Respondent Michael A. Johnston re #4 Motion for TRO, Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Commandant, #2 Exhibit List, #3 Exhibit )(Maag, Jared) Modified to remove repeated words re exhibit on 2/5/2021 (ca).
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER ENTERED: Respondent's First Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer to Court's Order to Show Cause (Doc. #6 ) is granted. Respondent is required to show cause on or before March 15, 2021, why the writ should not be granted. Petitioner is granted until April 15, 2021, to file a traverse thereto. Respondent shall have until February 5, 2021, to respond to Petitioner's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction at Doc. #4 , and Petitioner shall have until February 10, 2021, to file a reply. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 02/03/21. Mailed to pro se party David Brown by regular mail. (smnd)
February 3, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Respondent Michael A. Johnston (Maag, Jared)
February 2, 2021 Filing 5 DECLARATION IN SUPPORT of #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Petitioner David Brown. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (smnd)
February 2, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and MOTION for Preliminary Injunction with Memorandum of Law in Support by Petitioner David Brown. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (smnd)
January 13, 2021 Filing 3 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Jared S. Maag on behalf of Michael A. Johnston. (Maag, Jared)
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER ENTERED: Respondent is required to show cause on or before February 11, 2021, why the writ should not be granted. Petitioner is granted until March 11, 2021, to file a traverse thereto. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 01/12/21. Mailed to pro se party David Brown by regular mail; e-mailed to the U.S. Attorney for the District of Kansas. (smnd)
January 8, 2021 FILING FEE PAID: in the amount of $ 5.00, receipt number T4631014390. (jal)
January 8, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS filed by Petitioner David Brown. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits to Petition, #2 Envelope) (jal) (Attachment 1-1 replaced as directed by chambers on 2/18/2021). (smnd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Johnston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: David Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Michael A. Johnston
Represented By: Jared S. Maag
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?