Davis (ID 96411) v. Cline
Petitioner: Arthur William Davis, III
Respondent: Sam Cline
Case Number: 5:2021cv03129
Filed: May 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Sam A Crow
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2021 Filing 6 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Michael Joseph Duenes on behalf of Sam Cline. (Duenes, Michael)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER ENTERED: Respondent's Motion for Extension of Time (ECF No. #4 ) is granted. The deadline for Respondent to file an Answer and Return is August 31, 2021. Signed by U.S. Senior District Judge Sam A. Crow on 06/29/21. Mailed to pro se party Arthur William Davis, III by regular mail. (smnd)
June 28, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Respondent Sam Cline (Ailslieger, Kristafer)
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ENTERED: Respondent is to show cause within thirty (30) days from the date of this order why the writ should not be granted. Petitioner is granted thirty (30) days after receipt by him of a copy of Respondent's answer and return to file a traverse thereto. Signed by U.S. Senior District Judge Sam A. Crow on 06/02/21. Mailed to pro se party Arthur William Davis, III by regular mail; e-mailed to Attorney General for the State of Kansas. (smnd)
May 27, 2021 HABEAS FILING FEE PAID: in the amount of $ 5.00, receipt number T4631014836. (jsh)
May 24, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Mailed to pro se party Arthur William Davis, III by regular mail. Response deadline 6/23/2021. (jal)
May 24, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS filed by Petitioner Arthur William Davis, III. (jal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis (ID 96411) v. Cline
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Arthur William Davis, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Sam Cline
Represented By: Kristafer R. Ailslieger
Represented By: Michael Joseph Duenes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?