Garner v. United States of America
Petitioner: Frank J. Garner, Jr.
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 5:2021cv03138
Filed: June 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: John W Lungstrum
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2021 Filing 8 TRAVERSE by Frank J. Garner, Jr. re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (smnd)
July 6, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Brantley Declaration, #2 Attachment 2 - Cintron Declaration)(Jacobs, Michelle)
June 17, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE to the Court of current address by Petitioner Frank J. Garner, Jr.; another copy of the #5 Order to Show Cause was mailed to Petitioner Gardner at USP-Leavenworth. (smnd)
June 8, 2021 FILING FEE PAID: in the amount of $ 5.00, receipt number T4631014848. (jal)
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ENTERED: Petitioner must either pay the $5.00 filing fee or submit a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis by June 24, 2021. Respondent is required to show cause on or before July 6, 2021, why the writ should not be granted. Petitioner is granted until August 6, 2021, to file a traverse thereto. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 06/02/21. Mailed to pro se party Frank J. Garner, Jr. by regular mail; e-mailed to U.S. Attorney for the District of Kansas. (smnd) Modified text on 6/2/2021. (smnd)
June 2, 2021 Filing 4 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Missouri Western; Case Number 4:21-cv-00361. Electronic file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (smnd)
June 2, 2021 Case electronically transferred to District of Kansas. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Willis, Kathy) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 6/2/2021.]
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE: ORDERED that this petition for a writ of habeas corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241 is transferred to the United States District Court for the District of Kansas for all further proceedings. Signed on May 25, 2021 by District Judge Howard F. Sachs. (Davies, Cindy) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 6/2/2021.]
May 21, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Frank J Garner, Jr(Willis, Kathy) [Transferred from Missouri Western on 6/2/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garner v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Frank J. Garner, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Michelle A. Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?