Johnson v. Hudson
Petitioner: Derrick Johnson
Respondent: Donald Hudson
Case Number: 5:2021cv03144
Filed: June 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: John W Lungstrum
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2021 Filing 12 RECORD ON APPEAL retrieved by 10CCA consisting of Volume 1 - Pleadings re #9 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment. (Appeal No. 21-3141) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (smnd)
August 5, 2021 Filing 11 APPEAL DOCKETED in 10CCA on August 5, 2021, and assigned Appeal No. 21-3141 re #9 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment filed by Derrick Johnson. (smnd)
August 5, 2021 Filing 10 PRELIMINARY RECORD ON APPEAL transmitted to 10CCA re #9 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment. (Attachments: #1 Preliminary Packet) (smnd)
August 5, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #5 Memorandum and Order and #6 Judgment by Petitioner Derrick Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (smnd)
August 5, 2021 APPEAL FEE STATUS: filing fee not paid re: Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment #9 on behalf of Petitioner Derrick Johnson. (THIS IS A TEXT ONLY ENTRY-NO DOCUMENT IS ASSOCIATED WITH THIS TRANSACTION.) (smnd)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ENTERED: Petitioner's Motion for Reconsideration (Doc. #7 ) is denied. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 07/23/21. Mailed to pro se party Derrick Johnson by regular mail. (smnd)
July 16, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Reconsideration re #5 Memorandum and Order by Petitioner Derrick Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (smnd)
July 2, 2021 Filing 6 JUDGMENT regarding Memorandum and Order #5 dismissing petition without prejudice. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 07/02/21. Mailed to pro se party Derrick Johnson by regular mail. (smnd)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ENTERED: Petitioner's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Doc. #4 ) is granted. The petition is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 07/02/21. Mailed to pro se party Derrick Johnson by regular mail. (smnd)
June 28, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Petitioner Derrick Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Inmate Account Statement) (smnd)
June 28, 2021 Filing 3 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS (on court-approved form) filed by Petitioner Derrick Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (smnd)
June 15, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY mailed to pro se party Derrick Johnson by regular mail. Response deadline 7/15/2021. (smnd)
June 14, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS filed by Petitioner Derrick Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Envelope) (smnd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Derrick Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Donald Hudson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?