Walker v. Kansas, State of
Petitioner: Earnest Eugene Walker, Jr
Respondent: Kansas, State of
Case Number: 5:2021cv03150
Filed: June 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Sam A Crow
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2021 Filing 14 RECORD ON APPEAL retrieved by 10CCA consisting of Volume 1 - Pleadings re #9 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment. (Appeal No. 21-3137) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (smnd)
August 5, 2021 Filing 13 SUPPLEMENT (SIGNED NOTICE OF APPEAL) re #9 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment by Petitioner Earnest Eugene Walker, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (smnd)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER ENTERED: Petitioner shall file a duplicate notice of appeal bearing his signature. Petitioner is granted leave to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis. Signed by United States District Judge Sam A. Crow on 07/23/21. Mailed to pro se party Earnest Eugene Walker, Jr. by regular mail. (smnd)
July 23, 2021 Filing 11 APPEAL DOCKETED in 10CCA on July 23, 2021, and assigned Appeal No. 21-3137 re #9 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment filed by Earnest Eugene Walker, Jr. (smnd)
July 23, 2021 Filing 10 PRELIMINARY RECORD ON APPEAL transmitted to 10CCA re #9 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment. (Attachments: #1 Preliminary Packet) (smnd)
July 23, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEAL (not signed by petitioner) as to #7 Memorandum and Order and #8 Judgment by Petitioner Earnest Eugene Walker, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Fax Cover Sheet) (smnd)
July 23, 2021 APPEAL FEE STATUS: filing fee not paid re: Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment #9 on behalf of Petitioner Earnest Eugene Walker, Jr. (THIS IS A TEXT ONLY ENTRY-NO DOCUMENT IS ASSOCIATED WITH THIS TRANSACTION.) (smnd)
July 19, 2021 Filing 8 JUDGMENT re #7 Memorandum and Order dismissing this matter. Signed by deputy clerk on 7/19/2021. Mailed to pro se party Earnest Eugene Walker, Jr. by regular mail. (jal)
July 19, 2021 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ENTERED: Petitioner's motion to appoint counsel (Doc. #3 ) is denied. This matter is dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. No certificate of appealability will issue. Signed by U.S. Senior District Judge Sam A. Crow on 7/19/2021. Mailed to pro se party Earnest Eugene Walker, Jr. by regular mail. (jal)
July 14, 2021 Filing 6 RESPONSE by Petitioner Earnest Eugene Walker, Jr. re #4 Notice and Order to Show Cause. (smnd)
July 14, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Change of Address by Petitioner Earnest Eugene Walker, Jr.: now at 260 Iris Street, Bloomfield, Colorado 80020. (smnd)
July 1, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ENTERED: Petitioner is granted until August 2, 2021, in which to show good cause, in writing, to the Honorable Sam A. Crow, United States District Judge, why this action should not be dismissed because he is no longer in custody on the convictions he seeks to challenge. In his response, Petitioner shall also articulate the relief he seeks in this action. Signed by U.S. Senior District Judge Sam A. Crow on 07/01/21. Mailed to pro se party Earnest Eugene Walker, Jr. by regular mail. (smnd)
June 24, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Petitioner Earnest Eugene Walker, Jr. (smnd)
June 24, 2021 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT of Financial Status by Petitioner Earnest Eugene Walker, Jr. (smnd)
June 24, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS filed by Petitioner Earnest Eugene Walker, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits) (smnd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walker v. Kansas, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kansas, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Earnest Eugene Walker, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?