Adams (ID 117388) v. Butler
Petitioner: Boe W. Adams
Respondent: Kansas, State of and Jeff Butler
Case Number: 5:2021cv03226
Filed: September 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Sam A Crow
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER ENTERED: Respondent's motion for extension of time (Doc. #5 ) is granted. Respondent is granted to and including December 10, 2021 to file the answer and return. Signed by U.S. Senior District Judge Sam A. Crow on 10/19/2021. Mailed to pro se party Boe W. Adams by regular mail. (jal)
October 18, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Respondent Jeff Butler (Ailslieger, Kristafer)
October 7, 2021 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ENTERED: Petitioner's motion for appointment of counsel (Doc. #2 ) is denied. Signed by U.S. Senior District Judge Sam A. Crow on 10/7/2021. Mailed to pro se party Boe W. Adams by regular mail. (jal)
September 20, 2021 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ENTERED: Respondent is required to show cause within thirty (30) days from the date of this order why the writ should not be granted. Petitioner is granted thirty (30) days after receipt by him of a copy of Respondent's answer and return to file a traverse thereto. The clerk will modify the docket to reflect that Jeff Butler is substituted as respondent in this action. Signed by U.S. Senior District Judge Sam A. Crow on 09/20/21. Mailed to pro se party Boe W. Adams by regular mail; e-mailed to Attorney General for the State of Kansas. (smnd)
September 16, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Petitioner Boe W. Adams. (smnd)
September 16, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS filed by Petitioner Boe W. Adams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Envelope) (smnd)
September 16, 2021 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Notice sent to Petitioner Boe W. Adams stating he is incarcerated in a facility with mandatory electronic filing and should follow instructions available at the facility for transmitting pleadings electronically to the court. (smnd)
September 16, 2021 FILING FEE PAID in the amount of $5.00, receipt number T4631015071. (smnd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adams (ID 117388) v. Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Boe W. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kansas, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jeff Butler
Represented By: Kristafer R. Ailslieger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?