Dawson (ID 45207) v. Schnurr
Petitioner: Alcena M. Dawson
Respondent: Dan Schnurr
Case Number: 5:2021cv03261
Filed: November 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Sam A Crow
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 19, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 15, 2021 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ENTERED: Petitioner is granted until and including January 18, 2022, in which to show cause, in writing, to the Honorable Sam A. Crow, United States District Judge, why this matter should not be dismissed due to his failure to commence it within the one-year time limitation. Signed by U.S. Senior District Judge Sam A. Crow on 12/15/21. Mailed to pro se party Alcena M. Dawson by regular mail. (smnd)
December 12, 2021 Filing 4 AMENDED PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS filed by Petitioner Alcena M. Dawson. (smnd)
November 22, 2021 HABEAS FILING FEE PAID: in the amount of $ 5.00, receipt number T4631015241. (jsh)
November 15, 2021 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ENTERED: Petitioner is granted until and including December 15, 2021, in which to file a complete and proper amended petition, on court-approved forms, that cures the deficiencies identified in this order. The clerk of court is directed to send Petitioner the proper forms. Signed by U.S. Senior District Judge Sam A. Crow on 11/15/21. Mailed to pro se party Alcena M. Dawson by regular mail. (smnd)
November 10, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY mailed to pro se party Alcena M. Dawson by regular mail. Response deadline 12/10/2021. (smnd)
November 9, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS filed by Petitioner Alcena M. Dawson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits) (smnd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dawson (ID 45207) v. Schnurr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Alcena M. Dawson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Dan Schnurr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?