Shock v. Dedeke et al
Plaintiff: Jeffery A. Shock
Defendant: Andrew Dedeke, Eric Thorne and Mallissa Wardrop
Case Number: 5:2021cv03263
Filed: November 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Sam A Crow
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER ENTERED: Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time (ECF No. #4 ) is granted. The deadline for Plaintiff to submit the initial partial filing fee is extended to December 29, 2021. The failure to pay the fee as directed may result in the dismissal of this matter without further notice. Signed by Senior U.S. District Judge Sam A. Crow on 12/01/21. Mailed to pro se party Jeffery A. Schock by regular mail. (smnd)
November 29, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to Pay Initial Partial Filing Fee by Plaintiff Jeffery A. Shock. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (smnd)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER ENTERED: Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis #2 is granted. The Court assesses an initial partial filing fee of $20.00, calculated under 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(1). Plaintiff is granted to and including November 29, 2021, to submit the fee. Any objection to this order must be filed on or before the date payment is due. The failure to pay the fee as directed may result in the dismissal of this matter without further notice. Plaintiff remains obligated to pay the remainder of the $350.00 filing fee. The agency having custody of plaintiff shall forward payments from plaintiff's account in installments calculated under 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(2). The clerk is to transmit a copy of this order to plaintiff, to the finance office at the institution where plaintiff is currently confined, and to the court's finance office. Entered by U.S. Senior District Judge Sam A. Crow on 11/15/21. Mailed to pro se party Jeffery A. Shock by regular mail. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (smnd)
November 12, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Jeffery A. Shock. (Attachments: #1 Inmate Account Statement) (smnd)
November 12, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Jeffery A. Shock. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (smnd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shock v. Dedeke et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffery A. Shock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Dedeke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Thorne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallissa Wardrop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?