United States of America v. Rental Housing Developers of Pratt et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Rental Housing Developers of Pratt, Unknown Occupants of Rental Housing Developers of Pratt, Laurisa I. McAbee, Kathy Galloway, Rebecca A. Drake, Jetz Service Co., Inc., Brenda J. Boone, Nathan Manville, Rental Housing Developers of Pratt, a Missouri Limited Partnership, Mary A. Duran, Unknown Defendants, Lucinda A. Reid and Annette L. Honaker
Case Number: 5:2021cv04037
Filed: May 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Teresa J James
Referring Judge: Angel D Mitchell
2 Judge: Julie A Robinson
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1345
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by United States of America upon Jetz Service Co., Inc. served on 7/23/2021. Answer due 8/13/2021. (jsh)
July 20, 2021 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Rebecca A. Drake (issued to Attorney for service). (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (jsh)
July 20, 2021 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Mary A. Duran, Jetz Service Co., Inc., Lucinda A. Reid, Unknown Occupants of Rental Housing Developers of Pratt (issued to Attorney for service). (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (jsh)
July 1, 2021 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. Brenda J. Boone waiver sent on 5/26/2021, answer due 7/26/2021. (Jacobs, Michelle)
July 1, 2021 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. Laurisa I. McAbee waiver sent on 5/26/2021, answer due 7/26/2021. (Jacobs, Michelle)
July 1, 2021 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. Annette L. Honaker waiver sent on 5/26/2021, answer due 7/26/2021. (Jacobs, Michelle)
July 1, 2021 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. Kathy Galloway waiver sent on 5/26/2021, answer due 7/26/2021. (Jacobs, Michelle)
July 1, 2021 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. Nathan Manville waiver sent on 5/26/2021, answer due 7/26/2021. (Jacobs, Michelle)
June 16, 2021 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Rental Housing Developers of Pratt (issued to Returned to plaintiff for service). (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (jsh)
June 3, 2021 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James no longer assigned to case. Signed by deputy clerk on 6/3/21. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)(cs)
May 26, 2021 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Lawsuit, Waiver of Service of Summons and Complaint by United States of America. (Jacobs, Michelle)
May 26, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff United States of America. (Jacobs, Michelle)
May 26, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Topeka, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Note, #2 Exhibit B - Mortgage, #3 Exhibit C - Affidavit, #4 Exhibit D - Agreement)(Jacobs, Michelle)
May 26, 2021 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jsh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Rental Housing Developers of Pratt et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rental Housing Developers of Pratt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Occupants of Rental Housing Developers of Pratt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laurisa I. McAbee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathy Galloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebecca A. Drake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jetz Service Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenda J. Boone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nathan Manville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rental Housing Developers of Pratt, a Missouri Limited Partnership
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary A. Duran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Defendants
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lucinda A. Reid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Annette L. Honaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Michelle A. Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?