Holt v. Foot Locker Retail Inc
Plaintiff: Daniel Holt
Defendant: Foot Locker Retail Inc
Case Number: 5:2021cv04039
Filed: June 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Gwynne E Birzer
Referring Judge: John W Broomes
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Emily M. Pedersen for Foot Locker Retail Inc. pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 8/6/21. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ala)
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Joint Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 8/4/2021. (kf)
August 4, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for attorney Emily M. Pedersen to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5552137.) by Defendant Foot Locker Retail Inc (referred to Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer) (Harrison, Ashley)
August 3, 2021 Filing 8 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Defendant Foot Locker Retail Inc (referred to Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer) (Harrison, Ashley)
July 12, 2021 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of First Interrogatories and First Requests for Production by Foot Locker Retail Inc. (Harrison, Ashley)
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 8/17/2021 at 11:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer. Participants shall dial into the conference call at 888-363-4749, enter access code 9686294#, and follow the prompts to join the call. Report of Parties Planning Conference and Rule 26 Initial Disclosures due 8/10/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 6/22/21. (ala)
June 17, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint & Affirmative Defenses by Foot Locker Retail Inc.(Harrison, Ashley)
June 11, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Removal to Plaintiff by Foot Locker Retail Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Harrison, Ashley)
June 11, 2021 Filing 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendant Foot Locker Retail Inc - trial to be held in Topeka. (Harrison, Ashley)
June 11, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Defendant Foot Locker Retail Inc. (Harrison, Ashley)
June 11, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Geary County, case number GE2021CV000078 Trial location of Topeka ( Filing fee $402, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5511217.), filed by Foot Locker Retail Inc.(Harrison, Ashley) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/11/2021: #1 State Court Petition) (msb).
June 11, 2021 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge John W. Broomes and Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (msb)
June 11, 2021 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Designation of place of trial is missing; Civil cover sheet is missing; State court petition is missing. The filing party/attorney is directed to correct the deficiency immediately.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (msb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holt v. Foot Locker Retail Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Holt
Represented By: Randall W. Brown
Represented By: Stephen C. Thornberry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foot Locker Retail Inc
Represented By: William C. Martucci
Represented By: Ashley Nichole Harrison
Represented By: Emily M. Pedersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?