Shields (ID 107518) v. Zmuda
Petitioner: Brian C. Shields
Respondent: Jeff Zmuda
Case Number: 5:2022cv03069
Filed: April 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Sam A Crow
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER ENTERED: Respondent's motion for extension of time (Doc. #9 ) is granted. Respondent is granted to and including August 5, 2022 to file the PAR addressing timeliness. Signed by U.S. Senior District Judge Sam A. Crow on 06/02/22. Mailed to pro se party Brian C. Shields by regular mail. (smnd)
June 1, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Respondent Jeff Zmuda (Ailslieger, Kristafer)
May 4, 2022 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ENTERED: Petitioner's motion for extension of time to pay the filing fee (Doc. #4 ) is denied as moot and his motion to proceed in forma pauperis (Doc. #5 ) is granted. Respondent is granted to and including June 6, 2022, in which to file a Pre-Answer Response that complies with this order. Signed by U.S. Senior District Judge Sam A. Crow on 05/04/22. Mailed to pro se party Brian C. Shields by regular mail; e-mailed to Kansas Attorney General. (smnd)
May 3, 2022 Filing 7 ADDITIONAL EXHIBITS IN SUPPORT of #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Petitioner Brian C. Shields. (smnd)
May 3, 2022 Filing 6 RESPONSE by Petitioner Brian C. Shields re #3 Notice and Order to Show Cause. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits) (smnd)
May 3, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Petitioner Brian C. Shields. (Attachments: #1 Inmate Account Statement) (smnd)
May 3, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to Pay Filing Fee by Petitioner Brian C. Shields. (smnd)
April 12, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ENTERED: Petitioner is granted until and including May 12, 2022, in which to show cause, in writing, to the Honorable Sam. A. Crow, United States District Judge, why this matter should not be dismissed due to his failure to commence it within the one-year time limitation. Signed by U.S. Senior District Judge Sam A. Crow on 04/12/22. Mailed to pro se party Brian C. Shields by regular mail. (smnd)
April 8, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY mailed to pro se party Brian C. Shields by regular mail. Response deadline 5/9/2022. (smnd)
April 7, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS filed by Petitioner Brian C. Shields. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits) (smnd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shields (ID 107518) v. Zmuda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Brian C. Shields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jeff Zmuda
Represented By: Kristafer R. Ailslieger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?