Price v. Hill
Plaintiff: John Timothy Price
Defendant: Brian C. Hill
Case Number: 5:2022cv03200
Filed: September 9, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: John W Lungstrum
Referring Judge: James P O'Hara
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 12, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2022 Filing 5 JUDGMENT regarding Order #4 dismissing action without prejudice. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 10/12/22. Mailed to pro se party John Timothy Price by regular mail. (smnd)
October 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER ENTERED: This action is dismissed without prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b). Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 10/12/22. Mailed to pro se party John Timothy Price by regular mail. (smnd)
September 19, 2022 Filing 3 RESPONSE (titled Notice of Deficiency) by Plaintiff John Timothy Price re #2 Order. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (smnd)
September 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER ENTERED: Plaintiff is denied leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff is granted until October 11, 2022, to submit the $402.00 filing fee. The failure to submit the fee by that date will result in the dismissal of this matter without prejudice and without additional prior notice. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 09/12/22. Mailed to pro se party John Timothy Price by regular mail. (smnd)
September 9, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff John Timothy Price. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Price v. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Timothy Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian C. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?