Davis (ID 116257) v. Dalke et al
Plaintiff: Joel Arthur Davis
Defendant: Remington Dalke and Audra Asher
Case Number: 5:2022cv03204
Filed: September 15, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: John W Lungstrum
Referring Judge: James P O'Hara
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2022 Filing 8 JUDGMENT regarding Memorandum and Order #7 dismissing matter. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 10/24/22. Mailed to pro se party Joel Arthur Davis by regular mail. (smnd)
October 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ENTERED: This matter is dismissed for failure to state a claim. Plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Doc. #4 ) is denied. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 10/24/22. Mailed to pro se party Joel Arthur Davis by regular mail. (smnd)
September 26, 2022 Filing 6 RETURN Mail received re #2 Notice of Deficiency, addressed to Plaintiff Joel Arthur Davis. DE #2 has already been remailed to Plaintiff at current address on 9/16/2022. (jal)
September 23, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re #4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis mailed to pro se party Joel Arthur Davis by regular mail. Response deadline 10/24/2022. (smnd)
September 23, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Joel Arthur Davis (referred to Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara) (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (smnd)
September 23, 2022 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Notice sent to Plaintiff Joel Arthur Davis stating he is incarcerated in a facility with mandatory electronic filing and should follow instructions available at the facility for transmitting pleadings electronically to the court. (smnd)
September 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ENTERED: Plaintiff is provisionally granted leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff is granted until October 14, 2022, in which to show good cause, in writing to the undersigned, why Plaintiff's Complaint should not be dismissed. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 09/19/22. Mailed to pro se party Joel Arthur Davis by regular mail. (smnd)
September 16, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY mailed to pro se party Joel Arthur Davis by regular mail. Response deadline 10/17/2022. (smnd)
September 16, 2022 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Pursuant to the Kansas Department of Corrections, Plaintiff Joel Arthur Davis has been at the El Dorado Correctional Facility since September 15, 2022. Accordingly, his address has been updated on the docket sheet. (smnd)
September 16, 2022 DOCKET ANNOTATION: A copy of the #2 Notice of Deficiency, as well as docket sheet, was remailed to Plaintiff Joel Arthur Davis at El Dorado Correctional Facility. (smnd)
September 15, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Joel Arthur Davis. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (smnd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis (ID 116257) v. Dalke et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joel Arthur Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Remington Dalke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Audra Asher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?