Glendening et al v. Howard et al
Plaintiff: Jessica Glendening, Audra Asher, Colin Shaw and Laura Valachovic
Defendant: Laura Howard, Mike Dixon and Lesia Dipman
Case Number: 5:2022cv04032
Filed: May 26, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Gwynne E Birzer
Referring Judge: Toby Crouse
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of Scheduling Conference: THIS IS AN OFFICIAL NOTICE FOR THIS HEARING. Scheduling Conference set for 8/10/2022 at 01:30 PM in Topeka Courtroom 401 (TC) before District Judge Toby Crouse. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ta)
June 13, 2022 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Laura Valachovic, Jessica Glendening, Colin Shaw, Audra Asher. Mike Dixon waiver sent on 5/26/2022, answer due 7/25/2022. (Brett, Sharon)
June 13, 2022 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Laura Valachovic, Jessica Glendening, Colin Shaw, Audra Asher. Laura Howard waiver sent on 5/26/2022, answer due 7/25/2022. (Brett, Sharon)
June 13, 2022 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Laura Valachovic, Jessica Glendening, Colin Shaw, Audra Asher. Lesia Dipman waiver sent on 5/26/2022, answer due 7/25/2022. (Brett, Sharon)
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Eliana Machefsky for Audra Asher, Jessica Glendening, Colin Shaw and Laura Valachovic pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 6/2/22. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ala)
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER finding as moot #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Keisha L. James; granting #6 Amended Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Keisha L. James for Audra Asher, Jessica Glendening, Colin Shaw, and Laura Valachovic pursuant to D. Kan. Rule 83.5.4 for purposes of this case only. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 6/1/22. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ala)
May 31, 2022 Filing 8 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Bria Leigh Nelson on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Nelson, Bria)
May 27, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION for attorney Eliana Machefsky to appear pro hac vice ( Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5789455.) by Plaintiffs Audra Asher, Jessica Glendening, Colin Shaw, Laura Valachovic (referred to Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Eliana Machefsky, #2 ECF Registration Form Eliana Machefsky)(Bonds, Lauren)
May 26, 2022 Filing 6 Amended MOTION for attorney Keisha James to appear pro hac vice by Plaintiffs Audra Asher, Jessica Glendening, Colin Shaw, Laura Valachovic (referred to Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer) (Attachments: #1 James Affidavit, #2 ECF Registration Form )(Bonds, Lauren)
May 26, 2022 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiffs Audra Asher, Jessica Glendening, Colin Shaw, Laura Valachovic (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Brett, Sharon)
May 26, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiffs Audra Asher, Jessica Glendening, Colin Shaw, Laura Valachovic (Brett, Sharon)
May 26, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION for attorney Keisha James to appear pro hac vice (Pro hac vice fee $50, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5788539.) by Plaintiffs Audra Asher, Jessica Glendening, Colin Shaw, Laura Valachovic. (referred to Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 ECF Registration Form)(Bonds, Lauren)
May 26, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiffs Audra Asher, Jessica Glendening, Colin Shaw, Laura Valachovic. (Brett, Sharon)
May 26, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Topeka ( Filing fee $402, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5788344.), filed by Laura Valachovic, Jessica Glendening, Colin Shaw, Audra Asher.(Brett, Sharon)
May 26, 2022 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Toby Crouse and Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jsh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Glendening et al v. Howard et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Glendening
Represented By: Sharon Brett
Represented By: George F. Verschelden
Represented By: Joshua M. Pierson
Represented By: Kayla DeLoach
Represented By: Lauren Bonds
Represented By: Mark D. Hinderks
Represented By: Bria Leigh Nelson
Represented By: Eliana Machefsky
Represented By: Keisha L. James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Audra Asher
Represented By: Sharon Brett
Represented By: George F. Verschelden
Represented By: Joshua M. Pierson
Represented By: Kayla DeLoach
Represented By: Lauren Bonds
Represented By: Mark D. Hinderks
Represented By: Bria Leigh Nelson
Represented By: Eliana Machefsky
Represented By: Keisha L. James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colin Shaw
Represented By: Sharon Brett
Represented By: George F. Verschelden
Represented By: Joshua M. Pierson
Represented By: Kayla DeLoach
Represented By: Lauren Bonds
Represented By: Mark D. Hinderks
Represented By: Bria Leigh Nelson
Represented By: Eliana Machefsky
Represented By: Keisha L. James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Valachovic
Represented By: Sharon Brett
Represented By: George F. Verschelden
Represented By: Lauren Bonds
Represented By: Mark D. Hinderks
Represented By: Joshua M. Pierson
Represented By: Kayla DeLoach
Represented By: Bria Leigh Nelson
Represented By: Eliana Machefsky
Represented By: Keisha L. James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Dixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lesia Dipman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?