Leeds v. Allianz Risk Consulting, LLC et al
Plaintiff: LUANNE LEEDS
Defendant: ALLIANZ GLOBAL RISKS US INSURANCE COMPANY, and ASSUREDPARTNERS AEROSPACE L.L.C d/b/a AIRSURE LIMITED, L.L.C.,, Allianz Risk Consulting, L.L.C. doing business as Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company and AssuredPartners Aerospace L.L.C. doing business as AirSure Limited, L.L.C.
Case Number: 5:2022cv04046
Filed: August 31, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Angel D Mitchell
Referring Judge: Julie A Robinson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2022 Filing 15 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendant AssuredPartners Aerospace L.L.C. - trial to be held in Topeka. (Green, Samuel)
October 4, 2022 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by AssuredPartners Aerospace L.L.C. identifying None as corporate parent . (Green, Samuel)
October 4, 2022 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint by AssuredPartners Aerospace L.L.C..(Green, Samuel)
September 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 11/16/2022 at 10:00 AM in Telephone ADM - CONFERENCE LINE 1-888-363-4749 ACCESS CODE 3977627 before Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell. Rule 26 Planning Conference Deadline 10/26/2022. Rule 26 Initial Disclosures Deadline set for 11/4/2022. Proposed Scheduling Order Deadline 11/4/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell on 9/26/2022. (ht)
September 20, 2022 Filing 11 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 10/5/2022 for Defendant AssuredPartners Aerospace L.L.C. to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 9/20/2022. (ada)
September 6, 2022 Filing 10 Alias SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Luanne Leeds upon AssuredPartners Aerospace, LLC (Pope, Ronald)
September 6, 2022 Filing 9 Amended ALIAS SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Certified Mail by Luanne Leeds upon Kansas Insurance Commissioner for Allianz (Pope, Ronald) Modified title on 9/8/2022 (ca).
September 2, 2022 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Allianz Risk Consulting, L.L.C. (Schultz, John)
September 1, 2022 Filing 6 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Defendant Allianz Risk Consulting, L.L.C. - trial to be held in Topeka. (Uzelac, Danielle)
September 1, 2022 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Designation of place of trial is missing. The filing party/attorney is directed to correct the deficiency immediately. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jk)
September 1, 2022 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Julie A. Robinson and Magistrate Judge Angel D. Mitchell for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jk)
August 31, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Defendant AssuredPartners Aerospace L.L.C. served on 8/15/2022 by certified mail. (Originally filed in the Shawnee County District Court on 8/18/2022.) (mam)
August 31, 2022 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT byAllianz Risk Consulting, L.L.C. (Schultz, John)
August 31, 2022 Filing 4 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Danielle Marie Uzelac on behalf of Allianz Risk Consulting, L.L.C. (Uzelac, Danielle)
August 31, 2022 Filing 3 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by John G. Schultz on behalf of Allianz Risk Consulting, L.L.C. (Schultz, John)
August 31, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Defendant Allianz Risk Consulting, L.L.C. (Schultz, John)
August 31, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Shawnee County District Court, case number 2022-CV-000447, Trial location of Topeka (Filing fee $402, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5857954.), filed by Allianz Risk Consulting, L.L.C. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Schultz, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leeds v. Allianz Risk Consulting, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LUANNE LEEDS
Represented By: Ronald P. Pope
Represented By: Thomas B. Diehl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLIANZ GLOBAL RISKS US INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Danielle Marie Uzelac
Represented By: John G. Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: and ASSUREDPARTNERS AEROSPACE L.L.C d/b/a AIRSURE LIMITED, L.L.C.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allianz Risk Consulting, L.L.C. doing business as Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company
Represented By: Danielle Marie Uzelac
Represented By: John G. Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AssuredPartners Aerospace L.L.C. doing business as AirSure Limited, L.L.C.
Represented By: Samuel A. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?