Johnson (ID 79020) v. Wyandotte County District Court
Plaintiff: Ronald Johnson
Defendant: Wyandotte County District Court
Case Number: 5:2023cv03020
Filed: January 20, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: John W Lungstrum
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 13, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2023 Filing 7 RECORD ON APPEAL retrieved by 10CCA consisting of Volume I - Pleadings re #4 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment. (Appeal No. 23-3019) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (smnd)
February 7, 2023 Filing 6 APPEAL DOCKETED in 10CCA on February 7, 2023, and assigned Appeal No. 23-3019 re #4 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment filed by Ronald Johnson. (smnd)
February 7, 2023 Filing 5 PRELIMINARY RECORD ON APPEAL transmitted to 10CCA re #4 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment. (Attachments: #1 Preliminary Packet) (smnd)
February 2, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #2 Memorandum and Order and #3 Judgment by Plaintiff Ronald Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits from Case No. 23-3020-JWL, #2 10CCA Envelope) (smnd)
February 2, 2023 APPEAL FEE STATUS: filing fee not paid re: Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment #4 on behalf of Plaintiff Ronald Johnson. (THIS IS A TEXT ONLY ENTRY-NO DOCUMENT IS ASSOCIATED WITH THIS TRANSACTION.) (smnd)
January 23, 2023 Filing 3 JUDGMENT regarding Memorandum and Order #2 dismissing matter. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 01/23/23. Mailed to pro se party Ronald Johnson by regular mail. (smnd)
January 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ENTERED: Although summary remand is ordinarily required under the applicable statute, the posture of this case is such that there is no court to which it may be remanded. Therefore, dismissal is appropriate. If Johnson continues to submit frivolous or otherwise inappropriate notices of removal, the Court will consider filing restrictions. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 01/23/23. Mailed to pro se party Ronald Johnson by regular mail. (smnd)
January 20, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Wyandotte County District Court, Case Number 01-CR-2150, filed by Plaintiff Ronald Johnson. (smnd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson (ID 79020) v. Wyandotte County District Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyandotte County District Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?