Kansas, State of v. Crenshaw
Plaintiff: Kansas, State of
Defendant: Jackie Crenshaw and Jack Crenshaw
Case Number: 5:2023cv03059
Filed: February 27, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Office: Topeka Office
Presiding Judge: John W Lungstrum
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 24, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 24, 2023 Filing 11 APPEAL MANDATE from 10CCA: dismissing appeal. (Appeal No. 23-3064) (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Letter) (smnd)
April 24, 2023 Filing 10 APPEAL DOCKETED in 10CCA on April 24, 2023, and assigned Appeal No. 23-3064 re #8 Notice of Appeal filed by Jackie Crenshaw. (smnd)
April 24, 2023 Filing 9 PRELIMINARY RECORD ON APPEAL transmitted to 10CCA re #8 Notice of Appeal. (Attachments: #1 Preliminary Packet) (smnd)
April 21, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #2 Memorandum and Order and #7 Order by Defendant Jackie Crenshaw. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Letter, #2 Envelope) (smnd)
April 21, 2023 APPEAL FEE STATUS: filing fee not paid re: Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment #8 on behalf of Defendant Jackie Crenshaw. (THIS IS A TEXT ONLY ENTRY-NO DOCUMENT IS ASSOCIATED WITH THIS TRANSACTION.) (smnd)
March 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER ENTERED: Defendant Crenshaw's Motion for Extension of Time (Doc. #5 ) is denied. The Court will not be taking any further action on Defendant Crenshaw's March 17, 2023 submission at Doc. #6 or any future submissions. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 03/20/23. Mailed to pro se party Jackie Crenshaw by regular mail. (smnd)
March 17, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE to the Court (titled Question and Concern) by Defendant Jackie Crenshaw re #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Reconsideration. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (smnd)
March 17, 2023 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Reconsideration by Defendant Jackie Crenshaw. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (smnd)
March 6, 2023 Filing 4 CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT returned re #3 Letter from U.S. District Court to Saline County District Court. (smnd)
February 28, 2023 Filing 3 Letter from U.S. District Court to Saline County District Court regarding the remand of Case No. 2022-PR-76; mailed via certified mail (Certified Tracking #7020 3160 0000 9283 4809). A copy was sent to pro se party Jackie Crenshaw by regular mail. (smnd) Modified on 3/1/2023 to correct defendant name (kmc).
February 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ENTERED: This matter is remanded to the District of Court of Saline County, Kansas. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 02/28/23. Mailed to pro se party Jackie Crenshaw by regular mail. (smnd)
February 27, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Saline County District Court, Case Number 2022-PR-76, filed by Defendant Jackie Crenshaw. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Envelope) (smnd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kansas, State of v. Crenshaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jackie Crenshaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack Crenshaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kansas, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?