Cohagan v. Welch
Plaintiff: Dallas Shawn Cohagan
Defendant: Cynthia Ann Welch
Case Number: 5:2023cv04069
Filed: August 11, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Julie A Robinson
Referring Judge: Rachel E Schwartz
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 241 Conspiracy Against Citizen Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2023 Filing 9 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. The Magistrate Judge recommends the District Judge dismiss Plaintiff's federal claims pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii) because Plaintiff's complaint does not state a claim upon which relief may be granted. The Magistrate Judge further recommends that the District Judge decline to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over Plaintiff's remaining state law claims (to the extent the complaint could be read to assert any) and dismiss them without prejudice. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1), Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(b)(2), and D. Kan. Rule 72.1.4(b), Plaintiff may file written objections to this report and recommendation within fourteen days after being served with a copy. If Plaintiff fails to file objections within the fourteen-day period, no appellate review of the factual and legal determinations in this report and recommendation will beallowed by any court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz on 10/4/2023. Mailed to pro se party Dallas Shawn Cohagan regular and certified mail (tracking #7020 0640 0001 1580 0583). (mam)
September 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER. Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees (ECF No. #6 ) is granted. The U.S. Marshals Service shall withhold service on Defendant until further order of the Court. Plaintiff's Motion for Appointment of Counsel (ECF No. #7 ) is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz on 9/12/2023. Mailed to pro se party Dallas Shawn Cohagan by regular mail. (mam)
September 8, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Plaintiff Dallas Shawn Cohagan. (Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz.) (nac)
September 8, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Dallas Shawn Cohagan. NOTE - Access to document is restricted pursuant to the courts privacy policy. (Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz.) (Attachments: #1 Financial Affidavit)(nac)
August 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying without prejudice #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff has up to and including September 12, 2023, to refile using this District's form affidavit of financial status. Denying without prejudice #4 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz on 8/22/2023. Mailed to pro se party Dallas Shawn Cohagan by regular mail. (ca)
August 11, 2023 Filing 4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Plaintiff Dallas Shawn Cohagan. (referred to Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz) (nao)
August 11, 2023 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis - NOTE - Access to document is restricted pursuant to the courts privacy policy - by Plaintiff Dallas Shawn Cohagan (referred to Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz) (Attachments: #1 Financial Affidavit)(nao)
August 11, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Dallas Shawn Cohagan. (nao)
August 11, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (No Summons Issued) with trial location of Topeka, filed by Dallas Shawn Cohagan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(nao)
August 11, 2023 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Julie A. Robinson and Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE AVAILABILITY: A United States magistrate judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action if all parties voluntarily consent. Information & consent forms are available at http://www.uscourts.gov/forms/civil-forms/notice-consent-and-reference-civil-action-magistrate-judge (nao)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cohagan v. Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dallas Shawn Cohagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia Ann Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?