Davis (ID 83253) v. Kansas, State of et al
Petitioner: Kevin Tamar Davis
Respondent: Kansas, State of and David L. Dahl
Case Number: 5:2024cv03097
Filed: June 14, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: John W Lungstrum
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1651 Petition for Writ of Mandamus
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER ENTERED: The Court has received Petitioner's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (Doc. #9 ) which dismisses and closes this case. Petitioner also attached a letter to the Court expressing concerns about the lockdown and access to the law library at the Lansing Correctional Facility. These matters are unrelated to the claims in this case. If Petitioner believes he has a cause of action based on access to the law library, he should file an action after exhausting the facility's administrative grievance procedures. The Court directs the Clerk to send Petitioner forms and instructions for filing an action under 42 U.S.C. 1983. This case remains closed. Entered by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 07/09/24. Mailed to pro se party Kevin Tamar Davis with forms and instructions for filing an action under 42 U.S.C. 1983 by regular mail. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (smnd)
July 8, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by Petitioner Kevin Tamar Davis. (Attachments: #1 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit By a Prisoner, #2 Letter to Judge Lungstrum, #3 Envelope) (smnd)
July 8, 2024 Filing 8 ENTRY OF APPEARANCE by Robert C. Hutchison on behalf of All Defendants (Hutchison, Robert)
June 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ENTERED: The Court provisionally grants Petitioner leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Petitioner must comply with the Court's Notice of Deficiency at Doc. #6 by either paying the statutory filing fee of $405.00 or filing a motion for leave to proceed without prepayment of fees by the July 15, 2024 deadline. Failure to comply by the deadline may result in dismissal of this action without further notice for failure to comply with the Court's order. Petitioner is granted until July 18, 2024, in which to show good cause, in writing to the Honorable John W. Lungstrum, United States District Judge, why this action should not be dismissed. Signed by Magistrate Judge James P. O'Hara on 06/20/24. Mailed to pro se party Kevin Tamar Davis by regular mail. (smnd)
June 14, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY mailed to pro se party Kevin Tamar Davis by regular mail. Response deadline 7/15/2024. (smnd)
June 14, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE for Relief By a Person in State Custody by Petitioner Kevin Tamar Davis. (smnd)
June 14, 2024 Filing 4 DECLARATION IN SUPPORT of Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis by Petitioner Kevin Tamar Davis. (Attachments: #1 Inmate Account Statement) (smnd)
June 14, 2024 Filing 3 Letter to Clerk of the Court from Petitioner Kevin Tamar Davis re #1 Petition for Writ of Mandamus. (smnd)
June 14, 2024 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Petition for Writ of Mandamus by Petitioner Kevin Tamar Davis. (smnd)
June 14, 2024 Filing 1 PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS filed by Petitioner Kevin Tamar Davis. (Attachments: #1 Appendix List and Appendix A-L) (smnd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis (ID 83253) v. Kansas, State of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kansas, State of
Represented By: Robert C. Hutchison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: David L. Dahl
Represented By: Robert C. Hutchison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kevin Tamar Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?