Grannell v. Novo Nordisk A/S et al
Plaintiff: Karla R. Grannell
Defendant: Novo Nordisk A/S, Novo Nordisk North America Operations A/S, Novo Nordisk US Holdings Inc, Novo Nordisk US Commercial Holdings Inc., Novo Nordisk Inc., Novo Nordisk Research Center Seattle, Inc. and Novo Nordisk Pharmaceutical Industries LP
Case Number: 5:2024cv04037
Filed: May 6, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Kansas
Presiding Judge: Toby Crouse
Referring Judge: Rachel E Schwartz
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 17, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 17, 2024 Filing 4 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-13). Case electronically transferred to the Eastern District of Pennsylvania (MDL 3094). Signed by deputy clerk on 05/17/2024. (gw)
May 17, 2024 Case transferred to Eastern District of Pennsylvania (MDL 3094).(gw)
May 17, 2024 ***Civil Case Terminated pursuant to DE#4 . (gw)
May 17, 2024 DOCKET ANNOTATION: This case has been electronically transferred to the Eastern District of Pennsylvania (MDL 3094). All future filings should be made in that district under case no. 2:24-cv-02128. (gw)
May 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. The Court orders Plaintiff to show cause in writing to the Magistrate Judge by May 29, 2024. The Court also orders Plaintiff to file a Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(2) disclosure statement on or before May 29, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz on 5/13/2024. (kas)
May 6, 2024 Filing 2 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Karla R. Grannell - trial to be held in Topeka. (Ruane, Sarah)
May 6, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Topeka ( Filing fee $405, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-6340720.), filed by Garnell. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ruane, Sarah)
May 6, 2024 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Toby Crouse and Magistrate Judge Rachel E. Schwartz for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE AVAILABILITY: A United States magistrate judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action if all parties voluntarily consent. Information & consent forms are available at http://www.uscourts.gov/forms/civil-forms/notice-consent-and-reference-civil-action-magistrate-judge (jk)
May 6, 2024 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Designation of place of trial is missing. The filing party/attorney is directed to correct the deficiency immediately. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grannell v. Novo Nordisk A/S et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karla R. Grannell
Represented By: Eric D. Barton
Represented By: Sarah S. Ruane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novo Nordisk A/S
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novo Nordisk North America Operations A/S
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novo Nordisk US Holdings Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novo Nordisk US Commercial Holdings Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novo Nordisk Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novo Nordisk Research Center Seattle, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novo Nordisk Pharmaceutical Industries LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?