Eatinger v. BP America Production Company
Plaintiff: Gene R. Eatinger
Defendant: BP America Production Company
Case Number: 6:2007cv01266
Filed: September 7, 2007
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Office: Wichita Office
County: Kearny
Presiding Judge: Karen M. Humphreys
Presiding Judge: J. Thomas Marten
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 365 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 344 Motion to Exclude. See Order for details. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 9/12/2012. (cm)
January 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 243 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 195 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 206 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 1/24/2012. (cm)
August 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 166 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 129 Motion to Certify Class; denying 150 Motion to Sever. See Order for details. Signed by District Judge Eric F. Melgren on 08/02/2010. (pat)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eatinger v. BP America Production Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gene R. Eatinger
Represented By: Rex A. Sharp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP America Production Company
Represented By: Bradley Joseph LaForge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?