Midland National Life Insurance Company v. Johnson-Marin et al
Plaintiff: Midland National Life Insurance Company
Defendant: Quanett Johnson-Marin, Rito Duque Ramirez, 321 Henderson Receivables Origination, LLC and R.C. Henderson Trust
Case Number: 6:2008cv01367
Filed: November 19, 2008
Court: US District Court for the District of Kansas
Office: Insurance Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Monti L Belot
Presiding Judge: Donald W. Bostwick
Nature of Suit: Defendant
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1335 Interpleader Action

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 110 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 102 Motion for Attorney Fees; granting in part and denying in part 106 Motion for Attorney Fees. See order for details. Signed by District Judge Monti L. Belot on 8/8/2012. (aa)
January 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 98 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. Signed by District Judge Monti L. Belot on 1/9/2012. (aa)
December 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 68 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 64 Motion for Reconsideration ; denying 65 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by District Judge Monti L. Belot on 12/22/2010. (rm)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Kansas District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Midland National Life Insurance Company v. Johnson-Marin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Midland National Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Bradley Joseph LaForge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quanett Johnson-Marin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rito Duque Ramirez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 321 Henderson Receivables Origination, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R.C. Henderson Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?